EP0076591 - A transverse gearbox for a vehicle with an in-line engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.06.1987 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.06.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.08.1987 [1987/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deere & Company One John Deere Place Moline, IL 61265 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1983/15] | For all designated states DEERE & COMPANY 1 John Deere Road Moline, Illinois 61265 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Weiss, Heinz Volkerstrasse 24 D-6140 Bensheim / DE | [1983/15] | Representative(s) | Pears, David Ashley, et al REDDIE & GROSE 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | [1983/15] | Application number, filing date | 82304972.1 | 21.09.1982 | [1983/15] | Priority number, date | DE19813137805 | 23.09.1981 Original published format: DE 3137805 | [1983/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0076591 | Date: | 13.04.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0076591 | Date: | 27.08.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.01.1983 | Classification | IPC: | B60K17/04, F16H37/04 | [1983/15] | CPC: |
B60K17/04 (EP,US);
B60K17/08 (EP,US);
F16H37/042 (EP,US);
Y10T74/2186 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1983/15] | Title | German: | Quer angeordnetes Getriebe für ein Fahrzeug mit Reihenmotor | [1983/15] | English: | A transverse gearbox for a vehicle with an in-line engine | [1983/15] | French: | Transmission transversale pour un véhicule avec un moteur en ligne | [1983/15] | Examination procedure | 10.03.1983 | Examination requested [1983/20] | 25.05.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.09.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.03.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.07.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 20.02.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.04.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 16.05.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP84201390.6 / EP0142184 | EP84201391.4 / EP0145041 | Opposition(s) | 28.05.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | GB2051265 [ ] (RENK AG ZAHNRAEDER); | DE1285338 [ ] (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN); | DE1971348U [ ] (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE]); | GB1230738 [ ]; | EP0024100 [ ] (CATERPILLAR TRACTOR CO [US]) |