EP0076609 - Active voltage divider [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.05.1984 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DRESSER INDUSTRIES, INC. The Dresser Building Elm & Akard Streets P.O. Box 718 Dallas Texas 75221 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1983/15] | For all designated states DRESSER INDUSTRIES, INC. The Dresser Building Elm & Akard Streets P.O. Box 718 Dallas Texas 75221 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jones, Thaddeus Milton 2048 Trailridge, No. Mishawaka Indiana 46544 / US | [1983/15] | Representative(s) | Hughes, Brian Patrick, et al Graham Watt & Co. Riverhead Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 2BN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1983/15] | Hughes, Brian Patrick, et al Graham Watt & Co. Riverhead Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 2BN / GB | Application number, filing date | 82305048.9 | 24.09.1982 | [1983/15] | Priority number, date | US19810305862 | 28.09.1981 Original published format: US 305862 | [1983/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0076609 | Date: | 13.04.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.1983 | Classification | IPC: | G01R15/02, H02H9/04 | [1983/15] | CPC: |
G01R15/04 (EP,US);
H02H9/04 (EP,US);
Y10S323/903 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1983/15] | Title | German: | Aktiver Spannungsteiler | [1983/15] | English: | Active voltage divider | [1983/15] | French: | Diviseur de tension actif | [1983/15] | File destroyed: | 05.08.1991 | Examination procedure | 10.01.1984 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1984/27] | 21.03.1984 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1984/27] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE2244400 (BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE); | [Y]DE1051388 (SIEMENS AG); | [Y]DE1466749 (LICENTIA GMBH); | [Y]DE2244081 (KOFAHL PETER); | [XP]DE3009997 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) |