EP0078111 - A speed reduction device employing a face gear train and a method for making same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1983/18] | A speed reduction device employing a bevel gear train and a method for making same | ||
[1987/30] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.05.1988 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.05.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.07.1988 [1988/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nakamura, Takeichi 6-12, Hojo 6-chome Daitoshi Osaka / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1983/18] | For all designated states Nakamura, Takeichi 6-12, Hojo 6-chome Daitoshi Osaka / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1983/18] | Representative(s) | Valentine, Francis Anthony Brinsley, et al Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1983/18] | Valentine, Francis Anthony Brinsley, et al REDDIE & GROSE 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 82305208.9 | 30.09.1982 | [1983/18] | Priority number, date | JP19810156366 | 30.09.1981 Original published format: JP 15636681 | [1983/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0078111 | Date: | 04.05.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0078111 | Date: | 10.10.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0078111 | Date: | 22.07.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.08.1984 | Classification | IPC: | F16H1/32, F16H55/08 | [1984/39] | CPC: |
B23F15/06 (EP,US);
B23F19/025 (EP,US);
F16H1/321 (EP,US);
Y10T74/19958 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1983/18] | F16H1/32 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1983/18] | Title | German: | Geschwindigkeitsherabsetzungsvorrichtung unter Anwendung eines Kegelradgetriebes und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung | [1983/18] | English: | A speed reduction device employing a face gear train and a method for making same | [1987/30] | French: | Dispositif réducteur de vitesse employant un engrenage conique et sa méthode de fabrication | [1983/18] |
Former [1983/18] | A speed reduction device employing a bevel gear train and a method for making same | Examination procedure | 10.04.1985 | Examination requested [1985/26] | 03.04.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.08.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 21.01.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.04.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 03.04.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.04.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.08.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB191422839 (QUICK ALFRED ARTHUR [GB]); | [A]US1763177 (PERKINS JULIAN L); | [A]GB104515 (SKF SVENSKA KULLAGERFAB AB [SE]); | [A]US3258994 (GORFIN ALEX M) |