EP0076686 - Crop engaging device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 20.06.1991 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.1991 | Revocation of patent | published on 07.08.1991 [1991/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NATIONAL RESEARCH DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION 101 Newington Causeway London SE1 6BU / GB | [1983/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Klinner, Wilfred Erwin Beechwood Heath Lane Aspley Heath Woburn Sands Milton Keynes Buckinghamshire / GB | [1983/15] | Representative(s) | Laight, Martin Harvey, et al Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1983/15] | Laight, Martin Harvey, et al W.H. Beck, Greener & Co. 7 Stone Buildings Lincoln's Inn London WC2A 3SZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 82305274.1 | 04.10.1982 | [1983/15] | Priority number, date | GB19810029970 | 05.10.1981 Original published format: GB 8129970 | GB19810036651 | 04.12.1981 Original published format: GB 8136651 | [1983/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0076686 | Date: | 13.04.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0076686 | Date: | 09.04.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.01.1983 | Classification | IPC: | A01D80/02, A01D43/10 | [1983/15] | CPC: |
A01D43/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT, NL [1983/15] | Title | German: | Mitnahmeeinrichtung für Erntegut | [1983/15] | English: | Crop engaging device | [1983/15] | French: | Dispositif pour entraîner des produits de récolte | [1983/15] | Examination procedure | 05.10.1983 | Examination requested [1983/50] | 04.09.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.03.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.07.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 09.10.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.01.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 02.01.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP85104969.2 / EP0163123 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
07.01.1987
30.01.1987
ADMISSIBLE C. van der Lely N.V. 10 Weverskade NL-3155 ZG Maasland / NL Opponent's representative Louet Feisser, Arnold OCTROOIBUREAU VAN DER LELY N.V. Postbus 26 NL-3155 ZG Maasland / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1987/11] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
07.01.1987
30.01.1987
ADMISSIBLE C. van der Lely N.V. 10 Weverskade NL-3155 ZG Maasland / NL Opponent's representative Louet Feisser, Arnold Abraham Alfred OCTROOIBUREAU VAN DER LELY N.V. Postbus 26 NL-3155 ZG Maasland / NL | 07.04.1987 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 09.12.1987 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 28.01.1988 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M05) | 24.05.1988 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 18.11.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M06) | 19.05.1989 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 15.12.1989 | Date of oral proceedings | 22.01.1990 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 22.01.1990 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 01.02.1990 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 04.03.1991 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 14.03.1991 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1991/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE400041 (WILLIAM EDWARD MARTIN); | [A]DE690268 (LYTHALL MASCHF); | [AD]GB1493574 (NAT RES DEV); | [AD]US4021995 (HILL AMOS GROVER); | [AD]GB1322165 (NAT RES DEV); | [AD]GB967207 (WILLIAM THOMAS TEAGLE) | Examination | EP0065416 | GB2041173 | GB1548889 | GB1447026 | GB1283469 | GB198256 | US3559389 | US3173238 | US3151431 | US3127727 |