EP0077217 - Layered organic photoresponsive device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.02.1987 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.02.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.04.1987 [1987/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Xerox Square - 020 Rochester New York 14644 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1983/16] | For all designated states XEROX CORPORATION Xerox Square - 020 Rochester New York 14644 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chu, Joseph Y.C. 8 Kingswood Valleyview Road Norwalk Connecticut 06851 / US | [1983/16] | Representative(s) | Goode, Ian Roy, et al Essex House 12/13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1983/16] | Goode, Ian Roy, et al Rank Xerox Ltd Patent Department Parkway Marlow Buckinghamshire SL7 1YL / GB | Application number, filing date | 82305438.2 | 13.10.1982 | [1983/16] | Priority number, date | US19810310931 | 13.10.1981 Original published format: US 310931 | [1983/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0077217 | Date: | 20.04.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0077217 | Date: | 23.04.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.02.1983 | Classification | IPC: | G03G5/12, G03G13/01 | [1983/16] | CPC: |
G03G13/01 (EP,US);
G03G5/0436 (EP,US);
G03G5/047 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1983/16] | Title | German: | Mehrschichtige organische lichtempfindliche Vorrichtung | [1983/16] | English: | Layered organic photoresponsive device | [1983/16] | French: | Dispositif organique photosensible à couches multiples | [1983/16] | Examination procedure | 19.10.1983 | Examination requested [1983/52] | 01.07.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 16.10.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.01.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 07.01.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.01.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.09.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | Examination | US4078929 | EP0060621 |