EP0077676 - Radiation image recording system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.06.1987 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.07.1987 [1987/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. 210 Nakanuma Minamiashigara-shi, Kanagawa-ken 250-0123 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1983/17] | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. 210 Nakanuma Minamiashigara-shi Kanagawa-ken, 250-01 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kato, Hisatoyo c/o Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. 210 Nakanuma Minamiashigara-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1983/17] | Representative(s) | Cockbain, Julian, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1985/32] | Cockbain, Julian, Dr., et al Frank B. Dehn & Co. Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UZ / GB | ||
Former [1983/17] | Tomlinson, Kerry John Frank B. Dehn & Co. European Patent Attorneys Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 82305529.8 | 18.10.1982 | [1983/17] | Priority number, date | JP19810165117 | 16.10.1981 Original published format: JP 16511781 | [1983/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0077676 | Date: | 27.04.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0077676 | Date: | 07.09.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0077676 | Date: | 06.08.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.1983 | Classification | IPC: | G03B42/02, G03C5/17 | [1986/32] | CPC: |
G03B42/02 (EP,US);
G01T1/2016 (EP,US);
G03C5/16 (EP,US);
G21K4/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1983/36] | G03B41/16, G03B35/14, G03C5/17 | ||
Former IPC [1983/35] | G03B41/16, G03B35/14, G03C5/17 | ||
Former IPC [1983/17] | G03B35/14 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, NL [1983/17] | Title | German: | Strahlungsbild-Aufzeichnungssystem | [1983/17] | English: | Radiation image recording system | [1983/17] | French: | Système d'enregistrement pour image de rayonnement | [1983/17] | Examination procedure | 01.02.1984 | Examination requested [1984/16] | 09.01.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.05.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 27.01.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.04.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 12.04.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.05.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.10.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US4315318 [ ] (KATO HISATOYO, et al); | US4061915 [ ] (PFEIFER JOSEF, et al); | US4276473 [ ] (KATO HISATOYO, et al) | Examination | EP0022564 |