EP0079760 - Heat control system for packaging machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.07.1987 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Mead Corporation Mead World Headquarters Courthouse Plaza Northeast Dayton Ohio 45463 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1983/21] | For all designated states THE MEAD CORPORATION Mead World Headquarters Courthouse Plaza Northeast Dayton Ohio 45463 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ullman, John E. 2815 Edge Hill Road Huntingdon Valley Pennsylvania 19006 / US | [1983/21] | Representative(s) | Hepworth, John Malcolm Hepworth Lawrence Bryer & Bizley Bloxam Court Corporation Street Rugby Warwickshire CV21 2DU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1983/21] | Hepworth, John Malcolm Hepworth Lawrence Bryer & Bizley Bloxam Court Corporation Street Rugby Warwickshire CV21 2DU / GB | Application number, filing date | 82306001.7 | 11.11.1982 | [1983/21] | Priority number, date | US19810322443 | 18.11.1981 Original published format: US 322443 | [1983/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0079760 | Date: | 25.05.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0079760 | Date: | 05.10.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0079760 | Date: | 27.08.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.08.1983 | Classification | IPC: | B65B51/10, B65B11/50 | [1983/21] | CPC: |
B29C65/18 (EP,US);
B29C66/87441 (EP,US);
B29C66/91411 (EP,US);
B29C66/91421 (EP,US);
B29C66/91431 (EP,US);
B29C66/91651 (EP,US);
B29C66/961 (EP,US);
B65B11/50 (EP,US);
B65B51/10 (EP,US);
B29C66/5326 (EP,US);
B29C66/71 (EP,US);
B29C66/723 (EP,US);
B29C66/91213 (EP,US);
B29C66/91317 (EP,US);
B29C66/91653 (EP,US);
B29C66/919 (EP,US);
B29C66/934 (EP,US);
B29C66/94 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
B29C66/71, B29K2023/0633 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL [1983/21] | Title | German: | Erwärmungssteuersystem für eine Verpackungsmaschine | [1983/21] | English: | Heat control system for packaging machine | [1983/21] | French: | Système de commande de chauffage pour une machine d'emballage | [1983/21] | Examination procedure | 04.04.1984 | Examination requested [1984/24] | 15.03.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 13.08.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 19.02.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.05.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 15.05.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.05.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.01.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1984 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   31.01.1985 | 02.12.1985 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   20.01.1986 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 30.11.1986 | [1999/52] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3348474 (VIRTA NORMAN A, et al); | [A]FR2304518 (THIMON SAT SA [FR]); | [AD]US4036362 (ULLMAN JOHN E) |