EP0080353 - Apparatus and method for measuring temperature profile [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.09.1988 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FAG KUGELFISCHER GEORG SCHÄFER Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien Postfach 12 60 97419 Schweinfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/45] | For all designated states FAG KUGELFISCHER GEORG SCHÄFER Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien Postfach 12 60 D-97419 Schweinfurt / DE | ||
Former [1983/22] | For all designated states SCHLUMBERGER ELECTRONICS (U.K.) LIMITED 124 Victoria Road Farnborough Hampshire GU14 7PW / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Browning Smith, Kenneth 2 Millborough Road Tuffley Gloucestershire / GB | 02 /
Adams, Derek William 208 Old Bath Road Cheltenham Gloucestershire, GL53 9EQ / GB | [1983/22] | Representative(s) | Pears, David Ashley REDDIE & GROSE 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | [1986/47] |
Former [1986/45] | Rehmann, Klaus H. Postfach 1260 (FAG) Hauptbahnhofstrasse D-8720 Schweinfurt / DE | ||
Former [1983/22] | Pears, David Ashley REDDIE & GROSE 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 82306192.4 | 22.11.1982 | [1983/22] | Priority number, date | GB19810035559 | 25.11.1981 Original published format: GB 8135559 | [1983/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0080353 | Date: | 01.06.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0080353 | Date: | 04.07.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0080353 | Date: | 11.11.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.05.1984 | Classification | IPC: | G01J5/00, H04N5/33 | [1983/22] | CPC: |
G01J5/0022 (EP,US);
G01B15/02 (EP,US);
G01B21/045 (EP,US);
G01J5/08 (EP,US);
G01J5/0846 (EP,US);
G01J5/48 (EP,US);
G01J5/80 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [1983/22] | Title | German: | Apparat und Verfahren zum Messen eines Temperaturprofils | [1987/46] | English: | Apparatus and method for measuring temperature profile | [1983/22] | French: | Appareil et méthode pour mesurer un profil de températures | [1983/22] |
Former [1983/22] | Apparat und Verfahren zum Messen einer Temperaturprofils | Examination procedure | 15.11.1984 | Examination requested [1985/05] | 05.03.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 11.10.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.01.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 04.05.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.05.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 07.05.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.08.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.11.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 11.11.1987 | [1999/42] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2618906 (HEATH GLOUCESTER LTD); | [Y]US4032975 (MALUEG RICHARD M, et al); | [Y]US4225883 (VAN ATTA PETER W, et al); | [A]GB2068109 (EUROP ELECTRONIC SYST LTD) |