EP0081953 - Tool for preparing coaxial cable and for positioning and connection of coaxial connector therewith [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.06.1987 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.07.1987 [1987/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AMP INCORPORATED (a New Jersey corporation) P.O. Box 3608 470 Friendship Road Harrisburg Pennsylvania 17105 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1983/25] | For all designated states AMP INCORPORATED (a New Jersey corporation) P.O. Box 3608 470 Friendship Road Harrisburg Pennsylvania 17105 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bianchi, Edward Armond 64 Ethel Avenue Hummelstown Pennsylvania 17036 / US | 02 /
Gutter, David Henry Post Office Box 4055A Harrisburg Pennsylvania 17111 / US | [1983/25] | Representative(s) | Gray, Robin Oliver, et al BARON & WARREN 18 South End Kensington London W8 5BU / GB | [1983/52] |
Former [1983/25] | Wayte, Dennis Travers 20 Queensmere Slough, Berkshire SL1 1YZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 82306419.1 | 02.12.1982 | [1983/25] | Priority number, date | US19810330626 | 14.12.1981 Original published format: US 330626 | US19820376070 | 07.05.1982 Original published format: US 376070 | [1983/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0081953 | Date: | 22.06.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0081953 | Date: | 21.03.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0081953 | Date: | 13.08.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.01.1984 | Classification | IPC: | H01R43/00, H01R9/05 | [1983/25] | CPC: |
H01R43/00 (EP,US);
Y10T29/5138 (EP,US);
Y10T408/563 (EP,US);
Y10T408/567 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1983/25] | Title | German: | Werkzeug zum Vorbereiten eines koaxialen Kabels und zum Einstellen und Verbinden eines koaxialen Verbinders damit | [1983/25] | English: | Tool for preparing coaxial cable and for positioning and connection of coaxial connector therewith | [1983/25] | French: | Outil pour préparer un câble coaxial et pour le positionnement et la connexion d'un connecteur coaxial avec celui-ci | [1983/25] | Examination procedure | 23.08.1984 | Examination requested [1984/44] | 09.08.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.09.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 31.01.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.02.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 21.02.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.05.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2615948 (IRA KAMEN); | [YD]EP0038144 (AMP INC [US]); | [Y]US3665574 (BROWN CHRISTOPHER KINGSLEY, et al); | [A]DE392740 (VALVA MASCHB G M B H) | [Y] - MACHINERY, vol. 69, no. 5, January 1963, page 131, New York, US |