EP0082624 - X-ray cassette holder with beam-limiting device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 04.03.1986 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BRELL MAR PRODUCTS, INC. 6701 Highway 80 West Jackson Mississippi 39209 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1983/26] | For all designated states BRELL MAR PRODUCTS, INC. 6701 Highway 80 West Jackson Mississippi 39209 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Farrar, William B. 1849 Galena Avenue Montgomery Alabama 36106 / US | 02 /
Norton, Don S. P.O. Box 2105 Clinton Mississippi 39056 / US | [1983/26] | Representative(s) | Smith, Norman Ian, et al Cleveland 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1983/26] | Smith, Norman Ian, et al F.J. CLEVELAND & COMPANY 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 82306443.1 | 03.12.1982 | [1983/26] | Priority number, date | US19810329138 | 09.12.1981 Original published format: US 329138 | US19820363118 | 29.03.1982 Original published format: US 363118 | US19820363372 | 29.03.1982 Original published format: US 363372 | [1983/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0082624 | Date: | 29.06.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.04.1983 | Classification | IPC: | G03B41/16, A61B6/00 | [1983/26] | CPC: |
G03B42/04 (EP);
G03B42/025 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1983/26] | Title | German: | Röntgenkassettenhalterung mit Strahlbegrenzungsvorrichtung | [1983/26] | English: | X-ray cassette holder with beam-limiting device | [1983/26] | French: | Monture de cassette radiographique avec un dispositif à limitation de rayons | [1983/26] | File destroyed: | 04.12.1992 | Examination procedure | 21.12.1982 | Examination requested [1983/26] | 11.04.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.05.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.07.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 25.10.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.03.1985 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1986/17] | 21.03.1985 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1986/17] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.01.1985 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3038548 ; | [A]US3521057 ; | [A]US2939008 ; | [A]US2903588 ; | [A]US4088893 ; | [A]US3930164 ; | [A]US2264410 ; | [A]DE7030516U |