EP0082692 - Process for upgrading synthesis gas and catalysts therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.12.1988 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.01.1989 [1989/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE STANDARD OIL COMPANY Midland Building Cleveland, Ohio 44115 / US | [1985/04] |
Former [1983/26] | For all designated states The Standard Oil Company Patent & License Division Midland Building Cleveland Ohio 44115 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pesa, Frederick Anthony 764 Circlewood Drive Aurora Ohio 44202 / US | 02 /
Graham, Anne Marie 7304 Honeydale Drive Northfield Center Ohio 44067 / US | [1988/04] |
Former [1983/33] | 01 /
Pesa, Frederick Anthony 764 Circlewood Drive Aurora Ohio 44202 / US | ||
02 /
Graham, Anne Marie 7304 Honeydale Drive 103 Northfield Ohio 44067 / US | |||
Former [1983/26] | 01 /
Pesa, Frederick Anthony 764 Circlewood Drive Aurora Ohio 44202 / US | ||
02 /
Graham, Anne Marie 6290 Greenwood Parkway 103 Northfield Ohio 44067 / US | Representative(s) | Smith, Sydney, et al Elkington and Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1983/26] | Smith, Sydney, et al Elkington and Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 82306754.1 | 17.12.1982 | [1983/26] | Priority number, date | US19810332771 | 21.12.1981 Original published format: US 332771 | US19810332772 | 21.12.1981 Original published format: US 332772 | [1983/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0082692 | Date: | 29.06.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0082692 | Date: | 12.09.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0082692 | Date: | 27.01.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.07.1984 | Classification | IPC: | B01J23/89, B01J27/24, C07C1/04, C07C27/20, C07C29/15, C07C29/14, C07C29/136, C07C51/10 | [1983/26] | CPC: |
C07C51/10 (EP);
B01J23/89 (EP,KR);
B01J23/8946 (EP);
B01J27/24 (EP);
C07C1/0435 (EP);
C07C1/0485 (EP);
C07C29/157 (EP);
C07C29/158 (EP);
C07C31/04 (EP);
C07C31/08 (EP);
C07C9/00 (EP);
C10G3/00 (KR);
C07C2521/04 (EP);
C07C2521/08 (EP);
C07C2521/12 (EP);
C07C2521/16 (EP);
C07C2523/04 (EP);
C07C2523/42 (EP);
C07C2523/46 (EP);
C07C2523/72 (EP);
C07C2523/89 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C07C1/0435, C07C9/00 (EP);
C07C1/0485, C07C9/00 (EP);
C07C29/157, C07C31/04 (EP);
C07C29/157, C07C31/08 (EP);
C07C29/157, C07C31/10 (EP);
C07C29/157, C07C31/12 (EP);
C07C29/157, C07C31/125 (EP);
C07C29/158, C07C31/04 (EP);
C07C29/158, C07C31/08 (EP);
C07C29/158, C07C31/10 (EP); | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1983/26] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Katalysatoren zur Synthesegasaufwertung | [1983/26] | English: | Process for upgrading synthesis gas and catalysts therefor | [1983/26] | French: | Procédé et catalyseurs pour l'amélioration de gaz de synthèse | [1983/26] | Examination procedure | 05.02.1985 | Examination requested [1985/17] | 10.01.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.04.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.09.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.01.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.05.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 15.07.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.09.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 22.09.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP86200700.2 / EP0196732 | Opposition(s) | 28.10.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.11.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.11.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.11.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1831179 (JAEGER ALPHONS O); | [A]US2779802 (HARLAN JR JAMES T); | [Y]GB825762 (DEGUSSA); | [Y]GB1219281 (GAS COUNCIL [GB]); | [A]FR2231416 (HITACHI SHIPBUILDING ENG CO [JP]); | [A]US3939205 (KURATA TOKUZO, et al); | [Y]US3953363 (YAMAUCHI SHIN, et al); | [A]US4085157 (JUGUIN BERNARD, et al); | [X]FR2388781 (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL]); | [AD]US4206134 (FUNG SHUN C [US], et al); | [AD]EP0018763 (BRITISH PETROLEUM CO PLC [GB]); | [A]US4235798 (BARTLEY WILLIAM J [US], et al); | [A]US4261927 (DRAKE CHARLES A); | [Y]GB2074164 (NAT DISTILLERS CHEM CORP) |