EP0057112 - Electrical filter, self-correcting in propagation time [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.10.1986 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THOMSON-CSF 173, Boulevard Haussmann F-75008 Paris / FR | [1982/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Darmouni, Corinne THOMSON-CSF SCPI 173, bld Haussmann F-75360 PARIS CEDEX 08 / FR | [1982/31] | Representative(s) | Weinmiller, Jürgen, et al Spott, Weinmiller & Böhm Patentanwälte Sendlinger-Tor-Platz 11 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/20] | Weinmiller, Jürgen, et al Lennéstrasse 9 Postfach 24 D-82336 Feldafing / DE | ||
Former [1982/31] | Lincot, Georges THOMSON-CSF, SCPI, B.P. 329, 50, rue Jean-Pierre Timbaud F-92402 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 82400007.9 | 05.01.1982 | [1982/31] | Priority number, date | FR19810001294 | 23.01.1981 Original published format: FR 8101294 | [1982/31] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0057112 | Date: | 04.08.1982 | Language: | FR | [1982/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0057112 | Date: | 11.08.1982 | Language: | FR | [1982/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0057112 | Date: | 18.12.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.06.1982 | Classification | IPC: | H03H7/075 | [1982/31] | CPC: |
H03H7/1775 (EP,US);
H03H7/075 (EP,US);
H03H7/1708 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1982/31] | Title | German: | Die Laufzeit selbstkorrigierendes, elektrisches Filter | [1985/51] | English: | Electrical filter, self-correcting in propagation time | [1982/31] | French: | Filtres électriques autocorrigés en temps de propagation de groupe | [1982/31] |
Former [1982/31] | Selbst die Laufzeit korrigierendes, elektrisches Filter | Examination procedure | 14.01.1983 | Examination requested [1983/13] | 17.02.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.05.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 05.06.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.08.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 27.08.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.09.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.12.1985 | NL | 18.12.1985 | CH | 31.01.1986 | LI | 31.01.1986 | LU | 31.01.1986 | SE | 31.01.1986 | [1999/52] |
Former [1989/21] | AT | 18.12.1985 | |
NL | 18.12.1985 | ||
CH | 31.01.1986 | ||
LI | 31.01.1986 | ||
SE | 31.01.1986 | ||
Former [1989/14] | AT | 18.12.1985 | |
NL | 18.12.1985 | ||
SE | 31.01.1986 | ||
Former [1988/19] | AT | 18.12.1985 | |
NL | 18.12.1985 | ||
Former [1987/19] | AT | 18.12.1985 | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - ELECTRONIC INDUSTRIES, vol.23, no.1, janvier 1964, PHILADELPHIA (US) E.C. JOHNSON: "New developments in ..... designing bandpass filters", pages 87-94 | [A] - IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS, vol. CAS-24, no.5, mai 1977, NEW YORK (US) M. ORSUCCI et al.: "On the synthesis of bandpass filters with bridged topology", pages 252-260 | [AD] - IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON MICROWAVE THEORY AND TECHNIQUES, vol. MTT-20, no. 4, avril 1972, NEW YORK (US) ALI E. ATTA: "Narrow-Bandpass waveguide filters", pages 258-265 |