EP0060749 - Process for the recovery of fatty material and dry material in cheeses [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.12.1985 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BEUNET S.A. Le Breuil La Meilleraye de Bretagne F-44520 Moisdon La Rivière / FR | [1982/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Beunet, Joel Ker Riaden Le Chatelier F-35470 Pléchatel / FR | [1982/38] | Representative(s) | Le Guen, Louis François CABINET Louis LE GUEN 38, rue Levavasseur B.P. 91 35802 Dinard Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1982/38] | Le Guen, Louis François CABINET Louis LE GUEN 38, rue Levavasseur B.P. 91 F-35802 Dinard Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 82400330.5 | 25.02.1982 | [1982/38] | Priority number, date | FR19810005553 | 16.03.1981 Original published format: FR 8105553 | [1982/38] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0060749 | Date: | 22.09.1982 | Language: | FR | [1982/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0060749 | Date: | 16.01.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.08.1982 | Classification | IPC: | A23C15/14, A23C19/14, C11B1/12, A23J1/20 | [1982/38] | CPC: |
A23C15/14 (EP);
A23C19/09 (EP);
A23J1/20 (EP);
C11B1/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1982/38] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Rückgewinnung von fettigem Material und trockenem Material aus Käsen | [1982/38] | English: | Process for the recovery of fatty material and dry material in cheeses | [1982/38] | French: | Procédé de récupération de matière grasse et de matière sèche dans des fromages | [1982/38] | Examination procedure | 16.03.1983 | Examination requested [1983/23] | 03.04.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 27.06.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.09.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 05.09.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.10.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.01.1985 | IT | 16.01.1985 | NL | 16.01.1985 | SE | 16.01.1985 | LU | 28.02.1985 | [2007/44] |
Former [1999/52] | AT | 16.01.1985 | |
IT | 16.01.1985 | ||
NL | 16.01.1985 | ||
SE | 16.01.1985 | ||
LU | 28.02.1985 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 16.01.1985 | |
IT | 16.01.1985 | ||
NL | 16.01.1985 | ||
SE | 16.01.1985 | ||
Former [1989/17] | AT | 16.01.1985 | |
NL | 16.01.1985 | ||
SE | 16.01.1985 | ||
Former [1986/23] | AT | 16.01.1985 | |
NL | 16.01.1985 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE212797 ; | [A]US1485698 (NORTH CHARLES E) | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, 1955, colonne 529b, COLUMBUS, OHIO (US) & MOLOCHNAYA PROM. 15, no. 6, 38 (1954) F. SMORODIN: "Production of high-quality melted butter (butter oil)" |