EP0060775 - Combined coupling and buffing device for a railway vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.04.1986 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.1986 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AT | published on 05.11.1986 [1986/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RAIL CHIMIE Société Anonyme 7, Rue Galilée F-75116 Paris / FR | [1982/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Baronnet, André Gabriel Louis 8, rue de Bel-Air F-92190 Meudon / FR | [1982/38] | Representative(s) | Hoisnard, Jean-Claude, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1982/38] | Hoisnard, Jean-Claude, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université F-75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 82400430.3 | 10.03.1982 | [1982/38] | Priority number, date | FR19810004929 | 12.03.1981 Original published format: FR 8104929 | FR19810015087 | 04.08.1981 Original published format: FR 8115087 | [1982/38] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0060775 | Date: | 22.09.1982 | Language: | FR | [1982/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0060775 | Date: | 19.06.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.07.1982 | Classification | IPC: | B61G9/04, B61F1/10 | [1982/38] | CPC: |
B61F1/10 (EP);
B61G9/045 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL [1982/38] | Title | German: | Kombinierte Kuppel- und Puffervorrichtung für ein Eisenbahnfahrzeug | [1982/38] | English: | Combined coupling and buffing device for a railway vehicle | [1982/38] | French: | Dispositif combiné d'attelage et de tamponnement d'un véhicule ferroviaire | [1982/38] | Examination procedure | 04.11.1982 | Examination requested [1983/02] | 02.03.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.05.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.08.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 05.10.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.11.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 29.11.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.03.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.03.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 19.06.1985 | NL | 19.06.1985 | [1986/45] |
Former [1986/30] | NL | 19.06.1985 | Documents cited: | Search | DE67246 [ ]; | FR2409896 [ ]; | GB2053117 [ ] |