EP0060789 - Flow-through on-off valve [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1982/38] | Open or closed flow-through gate valve | ||
[1985/32] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.06.1986 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: GB | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMPAGNIE CENTRALE SICLI (Société Anonyme) 2/4, rue Blaise Pascal F-93152 Le Blanc-Mesnil / FR | [1982/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Voisembert, Sylvie 18, avenue de la Résistance F-93100 Montreuil / FR | 02 /
Mercier, Daniel 16 bis, Boulevard A. Briand F-93100 Montreuil / FR | [1982/38] | Representative(s) | Laget, Jean-Loup, et al Ipsilon Le Centralis 63, avenue du Général Leclerc 92340 Bourg-la-Reine / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1982/38] | Laget, Jean-Loup, et al Cabinet Pierre Loyer 77, rue Boissière F-75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 82400455.0 | 12.03.1982 | [1982/38] | Priority number, date | FR19810005197 | 16.03.1981 Original published format: FR 8105197 | [1982/38] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0060789 | Date: | 22.09.1982 | Language: | FR | [1982/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0060789 | Date: | 07.08.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.07.1982 | Classification | IPC: | F16K17/40 | [1982/38] | CPC: |
F16K17/403 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1982/38] | Title | German: | Durchflussabsperrventil | [1985/32] | English: | Flow-through on-off valve | [1985/32] | French: | Vanne à passage direct en tout ou rien | [1982/38] |
Former [1982/38] | Geschlossene oder offene Durchflussabsperrvorrichtung | ||
Former [1982/38] | Open or closed flow-through gate valve | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 14.12.1982 | Examination requested [1983/09] | 24.02.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.08.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 10.01.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.03.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 29.03.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.05.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.02.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.08.1985 | IT | 07.08.1985 | NL | 07.08.1985 | SE | 30.08.1985 | BE | 31.03.1986 | CH | 31.03.1986 | LI | 31.03.1986 | LU | 31.03.1986 | [2007/44] |
Former [1999/52] | AT | 07.08.1985 | |
IT | 07.08.1985 | ||
NL | 07.08.1985 | ||
SE | 30.08.1985 | ||
GB | 12.03.1986 | ||
BE | 31.03.1986 | ||
CH | 31.03.1986 | ||
LI | 31.03.1986 | ||
LU | 31.03.1986 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 07.08.1985 | |
IT | 07.08.1985 | ||
NL | 07.08.1985 | ||
SE | 30.08.1985 | ||
GB | 12.03.1986 | ||
BE | 31.03.1986 | ||
CH | 31.03.1986 | ||
LI | 31.03.1986 | ||
Former [1991/51] | AT | 07.08.1985 | |
NL | 07.08.1985 | ||
SE | 30.08.1985 | ||
GB | 12.03.1986 | ||
BE | 31.03.1986 | ||
CH | 31.03.1986 | ||
LI | 31.03.1986 | ||
Former [1989/27] | AT | 07.08.1985 | |
NL | 07.08.1985 | ||
SE | 30.08.1985 | ||
GB | 12.03.1986 | ||
CH | 31.03.1986 | ||
LI | 31.03.1986 | ||
Former [1989/22] | AT | 07.08.1985 | |
NL | 07.08.1985 | ||
SE | 30.08.1985 | ||
CH | 31.03.1986 | ||
LI | 31.03.1986 | ||
Former [1988/13] | AT | 07.08.1985 | |
NL | 07.08.1985 | ||
SE | 30.08.1985 | ||
Former [1986/47] | AT | 07.08.1985 | |
NL | 07.08.1985 | ||
Former [1986/32] | NL | 07.08.1985 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]LU28628 ; | [A]GB693636 (PYRENE CO LTD); | [A]AU486039B ; | [A]US4245660 (ROZNIECKI EDWARD J) | Examination | FR2437553 |