EP0063068 - Process for concentrically mounting an optical fibre in a ferrule [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1982/42] | Connecting device for an optical fibre, process for centering the fibre in this connecting device, and apparatus for realising this process | ||
[1985/39] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.07.1986 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 10.09.2008 [2008/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOCAPEX 10 bis, quai Léon Blum F-92153 Suresnes / FR | [1982/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dousset, René THOMSON-CSF SCPI 173, bld Haussmann F-75360 Paris Cedex 08 / FR | [1982/42] | Representative(s) | Ruellan-Lemonnier, Brigitte, et al Technicolor European Patent Operations 1-5 Rue Jeanne d'Arc 92443 Issy-les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/37] | Ruellan-Lemonnier, Brigitte, et al Thomson multimedia Patent Department 46 Quai A. le Gallo 92648 Boulogne Cedex / FR | ||
Former [1985/12] | Ruellan-Lemonnier, Brigitte, et al THOMSON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS 9 Place des Vosges La Défense 10 F-92400 Courbevoie / FR | ||
Former [1985/03] | Field, Howard John The Plessey Company plc Beeston Nottingham, NG9 1LA / GB | ||
Former [1982/42] | Vesin, Jacques THOMSON-CSF SCPI 173, Bld Haussmann F-75379 Paris Cedex 08 / FR | Application number, filing date | 82400556.5 | 26.03.1982 | [1982/42] | Priority number, date | FR19810006852 | 06.04.1981 Original published format: FR 8106852 | [1982/42] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0063068 | Date: | 20.10.1982 | Language: | FR | [1982/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0063068 | Date: | 25.09.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.08.1982 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/38 | [1985/39] | CPC: |
G02B6/3835 (EP,US);
G02B6/3834 (EP,US);
G02B6/3833 (EP,US);
G02B6/3861 (EP,US);
G02B6/3863 (EP,US);
G02B6/3898 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1982/42] | G02B7/26 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [1982/42] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur konzentrischen Montage einer optischen Faser in einem Anschlussstück | [1985/39] | English: | Process for concentrically mounting an optical fibre in a ferrule | [1985/39] | French: | Procédé de montage concentrique d'une fibre optique dans un embout | [1985/39] |
Former [1982/42] | Anschlussstück für eine optische Faser, Verfahren zur Zentrierung der Faser in diesem Anschlussstück und Anordnung für die Durchführung dieses Verfahrens | ||
Former [1982/42] | Connecting device for an optical fibre, process for centering the fibre in this connecting device, and apparatus for realising this process | ||
Former [1982/42] | Embout de connecteur pour fibre optique, procédé de centrage d'une fibre dans cet embout, et dispositif pour la mise en oeuvre de ce procédé | Examination procedure | 02.11.1982 | Examination requested [1983/02] | 21.09.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.01.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.04.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.07.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 18.01.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.03.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 09.03.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.06.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.02.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2408152 (BUNKER RAMO [US]); | [A]US4135781 (ARCHER JOHN D); | [A]GB2040062 (GREEN PRECISION IND LTD LEE); | [A]FR2310578 (ITT [US]); | [AP]WO8103227 (LIDHOLT L); | [A]FR2291509 (CIT ALCATEL [FR]); | [A]FR2306458 (THOMSON CSF [FR]); | [A]EP0026139 (SOCAPEX [FR]); | [AD]US4193664 (ELLWOOD GEORGE [GB]) | [A] - NTC'77 CONFERENCE RECORD, volume 2, 1977, NEW YORK (US) M.L. DAKSS: "Review of recent fiber splicing techniques" pages 23.5-1 - 23.5-5 | Examination | GB1480445 | US4113346 | GB1458896 | EP0008941 |