EP0063972 - Method and device for resource allocation in a system comprising autonomous data processing units [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.05.1986 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.07.1986 [1986/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THOMSON-CSF 173, Boulevard Haussmann F-75008 Paris / FR | [1982/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ballegeer, Jean-Claude THOMSON-CSF SCPI 173, bld Haussmann F-75360 Paris Cedex 08 / FR | 02 /
Nguyen, Duyet Huu THOMSON-CSF SCPI 173, bld Haussmann F-75360 Paris Cedex 08 / FR | [1982/44] | Representative(s) | Lepercque, Jean, et al Thomson-CSF Propriété Intellectuelle 92045 PARIS LA DEFENSE CEDEX 67 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1982/44] | Lepercque, Jean, et al THOMSON-CSF SCPI F-92045 PARIS LA DEFENSE CEDEX 67 / FR | Application number, filing date | 82400559.9 | 26.03.1982 | [1982/44] | Priority number, date | FR19810007036 | 08.04.1981 Original published format: FR 8107036 | [1982/44] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0063972 | Date: | 03.11.1982 | Language: | FR | [1982/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0063972 | Date: | 17.07.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.08.1982 | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/14 | [1985/29] | CPC: |
G06F13/374 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1982/44] | G06F3/04 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT, NL [1982/44] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Anordnung zur Hilfsquellenzuteilung in einem eine autonome Datenverarbeitungseinheit umfassenden System | [1982/44] | English: | Method and device for resource allocation in a system comprising autonomous data processing units | [1982/44] | French: | Procédé et dispositif d'allocation d'une ressource dans un système comportant des unités de traitement de données autonomes | [1982/44] | Examination procedure | 22.11.1982 | Examination requested [1983/04] | 16.08.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.12.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.01.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.03.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 17.08.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.10.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 26.10.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.04.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.02.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4209838 (ALCORN THOMAS E JR [US], et al); | [A]GB1217355 (IBM [US]); | [A]US3553656 (BERNHARDT DONN E); | [A]US4177450 (SARRAND PIERRE [FR]); | [AD]FR2376464 (SCHLUMBERGER PROSPECTION [FR]) | Examination | - COMPUTER DESIGN, vol.17, no.1, avril 1978, Concord (US) K. SOE HOJBERG: "One-step programmable arbiters for multiprocessors", pages 154 à 158 | - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol.22, no.3, août 1979, New York (US) A. BLUM: "Look-ahead access request circuit for computer systems", pages 1059 à 1060 | - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol.23, no.7A, décembre 1980, New York (US) D.F. BANTZ et al.:"Asynchronous contention resolution", pages 3043 à 3044 | - Fall Joint Computer Conference, 1972, pages 719 à 732 |