EP0065429 - Method and apparatus for the optical measurement of displacement, and its application to step and repeat photoreproduction [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.03.1985 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EUROMASK 4, rue de Presbourg 75116 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1982/47] | For all designated states EUROMASK 4, rue de Presbourg F-75116 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tigreat, Paul 19, Allée des Mitaillères F-38240 Meylan / FR | 02 /
Berger, Laurent 31, Avenue de la Plaine Fleurie F-38240 Meylan / FR | [1982/47] | Representative(s) | Fort, Jacques, et al CABINET PLASSERAUD 84, rue d'Amsterdam 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1982/47] | Fort, Jacques, et al CABINET PLASSERAUD 84, rue d'Amsterdam F-75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 82400637.3 | 06.04.1982 | [1982/47] | Priority number, date | FR19810007708 | 16.04.1981 Original published format: FR 8107708 | [1982/47] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0065429 | Date: | 24.11.1982 | Language: | FR | [1982/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.09.1982 | Classification | IPC: | G01B9/02, G01D5/38 | [1982/47] | CPC: |
G01D5/38 (EP);
G01B2290/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, GB, IT, LI, NL [1982/47] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur optischen Wegmessung und Verwendung zur schrittweisen Photoreproduktion | [1982/47] | English: | Method and apparatus for the optical measurement of displacement, and its application to step and repeat photoreproduction | [1982/47] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de mesure optique de déplacement et application aux photorépéteurs sur tranche | [1982/47] | File destroyed: | 13.07.1991 | Examination procedure | 09.05.1983 | Examination requested [1983/29] | 29.06.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.11.1984 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1985/21] | 10.12.1984 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1985/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR2361628 ; | [Y]FR2454602 ; | [X]WO7900433 |