EP0063998 - Dual master cylinder [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.05.1986 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.07.1986 [1986/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE BENDIX CORPORATION Executive Offices Bendix Center Southfield Michigan 48037 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1982/44] | For all designated states THE BENDIX CORPORATION Executive Offices Bendix Center Southfield Michigan 48037 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Crumb, Donald Arthur 105 Bercado Place 3 Mishawaka Indiana 46544 / US | [1982/44] | Representative(s) | Huchet, André, et al Division Technique Service Brevets Bendix Europe 126, rue de Stalingrad 93700 Drancy / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1982/44] | Huchet, André, et al Division Technique Service Brevets Bendix Europe 126, rue de Stalingrad F-93700 Drancy / FR | Application number, filing date | 82400687.8 | 16.04.1982 | [1982/44] | Priority number, date | US19810258827 | 29.04.1981 Original published format: US 258827 | [1982/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0063998 | Date: | 03.11.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0063998 | Date: | 31.07.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.08.1982 | Classification | IPC: | B60T11/20, B60T11/28 | [1982/44] | CPC: |
B60T11/28 (EP,US);
B60T11/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1982/44] | Title | German: | Tandem-Hauptzylinder | [1982/44] | English: | Dual master cylinder | [1982/44] | French: | Maître-cylindre en tandem | [1982/44] | Examination procedure | 28.04.1982 | Examination requested [1982/44] | 24.04.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.08.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.10.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 15.01.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.03.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 13.03.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.05.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.04.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3818706 (GAISER R); | [A]US3555822 (RIVETTI ENRICO); | [A]US3701257 (GAISER ROBERT F); | [A]GB1245542 (WODESLAVSKY JOSEF [IL]) |