EP0064009 - Rotatable pneumatic starter motor for an internal-combustion engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 28.03.1985 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 22.07.2009 [2009/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMPRESSEURS ERVOR ENVE S.A. 6 et 8 rue Huntzinger F-92110 Clichy / FR | [1982/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Faux, Albert René 26 rue de la Libération F-29214 Lannilis / FR | 02 /
Wrzonski, Jacques 15 rue Raynouard F-75016 Paris / FR | [1982/44] | Representative(s) | Lepeudry-Gautherat, Thérèse, et al Lepeudry et Associés 43 Rue de la Brèche aux Loups 75012 Paris / FR | [2009/30] |
Former [1982/44] | Lepeudry-Gautherat, Thérèse, et al Armengaud Jeune Cabinet Lepeudry 23 boulevard de Strasbourg F-75010 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 82400736.3 | 26.04.1982 | [1982/44] | Priority number, date | FR19810008427 | 28.04.1981 Original published format: FR 8108427 | [1982/44] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0064009 | Date: | 03.11.1982 | Language: | FR | [1982/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.09.1982 | Classification | IPC: | F02N7/08, F02N15/06, F02N15/04 | [1982/44] | CPC: |
F02N15/04 (EP);
F02N15/06 (EP);
F02N7/08 (EP);
F02B3/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [1982/44] | Title | German: | Drehbarer pneumatischer Anlasser für Verbrennungsmotor | [1982/44] | English: | Rotatable pneumatic starter motor for an internal-combustion engine | [1982/44] | French: | Démarreur pneumatique rotatif pour moteur à combustion interne | [1982/44] | File destroyed: | 13.07.1991 | Examination procedure | 31.03.1983 | Examination requested [1983/25] | 14.12.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.04.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.05.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 07.08.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.12.1984 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1985/22] | 27.12.1984 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1985/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.04.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2463868 ; | [A]US3094845 ; | [A]US3143105 ; | [A]US3816040 ; | [A]US4170210 ; | [AP]GB2077361 ; | [A]FR2431039 |