EP0072295 - Fuel supply device for a diesel engine, particularly of small and medium power size [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 22.04.1986 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOCIETE AUXILIAIRE DE REPARATIONS MECANIQUES S.A.R.M. 19 rue du Pont V F-76600 Le Havre Seine Maritime / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1983/07] | For all designated states SOCIETE AUXILIAIRE DE REPARATIONS MECANIQUES S.A.R.M. 19 rue du Pont V F-76600 Le Havre Seine Maritime / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ledru, Jean Pierre Georges Turretot F-76280 Criquetot / FR | [1983/07] | Representative(s) | Madeuf, René Louis, et al Cabinet Madeuf 7, rue de Monceau 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1983/07] | Madeuf, René Louis, et al Cabinet Madeuf, Conseils en Propriété Industrielle, 3, Avenue Bugeaud F-75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 82401412.0 | 29.07.1982 | [1983/07] | Priority number, date | FR19810015040 | 03.08.1981 Original published format: FR 8115040 | [1983/07] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0072295 | Date: | 16.02.1983 | Language: | FR | [1983/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0072295 | Date: | 07.12.1983 | Language: | FR | [1983/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.10.1983 | Classification | IPC: | F02D19/08 | [1983/07] | CPC: |
F02M31/16 (EP,US);
F02D19/0605 (EP);
F02D19/0628 (EP);
F02D19/0634 (EP);
F02D19/0657 (EP);
F02D19/0665 (EP);
F02D19/0684 (EP);
F02D19/081 (EP);
F02B3/06 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1983/07] | Title | German: | Brennstoffzufuhrvorrichtung für Dieselmaschine, insbesondere für schwache und mittlere Leistung | [1983/07] | English: | Fuel supply device for a diesel engine, particularly of small and medium power size | [1983/07] | French: | Dispositif d'alimentation en combustible pour moteurs diesel, notamment de faible et moyenne puissance | [1983/07] | File destroyed: | 04.12.1992 | Examination procedure | 30.07.1982 | Examination requested [1983/07] | 23.03.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.07.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.09.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.12.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 08.03.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 08.08.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.01.1986 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1986/24] | 17.01.1986 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1986/24] | 03.03.1986 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1985 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB841261 (CALIPORNIA RES CORP); | [A]US3415264 (GRAHAM BROWN STANLEY, et al); | [A]WO8101803 (IMO INDUSTRI AB [SE], et al); | [A]US2984229 (VAUGHAN PAUL S); | [A]FR2465886 (SHOWA LINE LTD [JP]) | [YP] - MTZ MOTORTECHNISCHE ZEITSCHRIFT, vol. 42, no. 10, octobre 1981, page 435, Schw{bisch Gm}nd, DE; "Brennstoff-Mischsystem FLU-MIX-DOS 80". | [A] - SHIPBUILDING & MARINE ENGINEERING INTERNATIONAL, vol. 102, no. 1230, juillet/août 1979, page 324, Whitehall Press, Maidstone, Kent, GB; "Blender module". |