EP0076178 - Method and installation for checking installed carburetors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.10.1987 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.11.1987 [1987/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOLEX 19, rue Lavoisier F-92002 Nanterre Cédex / FR | [1986/36] |
Former [1983/14] | For all designated states SOCIETE INDUSTRIELLE DE BREVETS ET D'ETUDES S.I.B.E. 19, rue Lavoisier F-92002 Nanterre Cedex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Parel, Jacques 65, Chemin de Bellevue F-78400 Chatou / FR | [1983/14] | Representative(s) | Fort, Jacques, et al CABINET PLASSERAUD 84, rue d'Amsterdam 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1983/14] | Fort, Jacques, et al CABINET PLASSERAUD 84, rue d'Amsterdam F-75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 82401520.0 | 11.08.1982 | [1983/14] | Priority number, date | FR19810018484 | 30.09.1981 Original published format: FR 8118484 | [1983/14] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0076178 | Date: | 06.04.1983 | Language: | FR | [1983/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0076178 | Date: | 07.12.1983 | Language: | FR | [1983/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0076178 | Date: | 10.12.1986 | Language: | FR | [1986/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.1983 | Classification | IPC: | F02M19/01 | [1983/14] | CPC: |
F02M19/01 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1983/14] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Prüfung von montierten Vergasern | [1983/14] | English: | Method and installation for checking installed carburetors | [1983/14] | French: | Procédé et installation de contrôle en place de carburateurs | [1983/14] | Examination procedure | 27.04.1984 | Examination requested [1984/28] | 06.03.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.07.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.12.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 10.04.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.06.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 09.06.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.09.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.07.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.07.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.07.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2465992 (SIBE [FR]); | [AD]FR2354552 (DEUTSCHE VERGASER GMBH CO KG [DE]) | [A] - REVUE TECHNIQUE AUTOMOBILE, no. 335, mai 1974, pages 106-107, Boulogne-Billancourt, FR. |