EP0079263 - Embossing machine with pressure rolls [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.01.1987 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.01.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.03.1987 [1987/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PRODUCTIONS TEXTILES ET PLASTIQUES DE LA MARNE S.A. Rue du Vivier 51160 Ay / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1983/20] | For all designated states PRODUCTIONS TEXTILES ET PLASTIQUES DE LA MARNE S.A. Rue du Vivier F-51160 Ay / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Laval, Michel Jean André Les Ardannes F-51500 Rilly-La-Montagne / FR | [1983/20] | Representative(s) | Gérardin, Robert Jean René Cabinet Robert Gérardin 3A, avenue Georges Clémenceau Boîte Postale 2 764 51066 Reims Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1983/20] | Gérardin, Robert Jean René Cabinet Robert Gérardin 3A, avenue Georges Clémenceau Boîte Postale 2 719 F-51055 Reims Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 82401956.6 | 22.10.1982 | [1983/20] | Priority number, date | FR19810020899 | 05.11.1981 Original published format: FR 8120899 | [1983/20] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0079263 | Date: | 18.05.1983 | Language: | FR | [1983/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0079263 | Date: | 02.04.1986 | Language: | FR | [1986/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.03.1983 | Classification | IPC: | B29C59/04 | [1986/14] | CPC: |
B29C65/02 (EP,US);
B29C59/046 (EP,US);
B29C66/8221 (EP,US);
B29C66/8242 (EP,US);
B29C66/83413 (EP,US);
B29C66/9161 (EP,US);
B29C66/9241 (EP,US);
B29C66/92611 (EP,US);
B29C66/93441 (EP,US);
B29C66/93451 (EP,US);
B29C59/04 (EP,US);
B29C65/08 (EP,US);
B29C65/103 (EP,US);
B29C65/106 (EP,US);
B29C65/14 (EP,US);
B29C65/1412 (EP,US);
B29C65/1425 (EP,US);
B29C66/45 (EP,US);
B29C66/727 (EP,US);
B29C66/8324 (EP,US);
B29C66/83241 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
B29C65/103, B29C65/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1983/20] | B29C15/00, B32B31/20 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, GB, IT, SE [1983/20] | Title | German: | Prägemaschine mit Druckwalzen | [1983/20] | English: | Embossing machine with pressure rolls | [1983/20] | French: | Machine d'impression à cylindres presseurs | [1983/20] | Examination procedure | 20.09.1983 | Examination requested [1983/48] | 14.08.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.12.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 03.10.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.11.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 19.11.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.01.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2585915 (CHAVANNES MARC A); | [Y]DE1479884 (AGRICOLA REG); | [Y]US4054701 (HAHN ALVIN J); | [A]GB2032834 (CELLOFOAM GMBH) |