EP0081401 - System for the temporary holding and releasing of two parts, especially in space technology [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.01.1988 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.01.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.03.1988 [1988/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOCIETE NATIONALE INDUSTRIELLE AEROSPATIALE Société dite: 37 Boulevard de Montmorency 75781 Paris Cedex 16 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1983/43] | For all designated states SOCIETE NATIONALE INDUSTRIELLE AEROSPATIALE Société dite: 37 Boulevard de Montmorency F-75781 Paris Cedex 16 / FR | ||
Former [1983/24] | For all designated states SOCIETE NATIONALE INDUSTRIELLE AEROSPATIALE 37 boulevard de Montmorency F-75781 Paris Cedex 16 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vezain, Gérard Domaine de Maure-Vieil Villa 137 F-06210 Mandelieu / FR | 02 /
Vermalle, Jean-Claude 893, Rue Janvier Passero La Chartreuse F-06210 Mandelieu / FR | [1983/24] | Representative(s) | Rinuy, Guy, et al Cabinet Rinuy, Santarelli 14, Avenue de la Grande Armée 75017 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1983/24] | Rinuy, Guy, et al Cabinet Rinuy et Santarelli 14, Avenue de la Grande Armée F-75017 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 82402002.8 | 28.10.1982 | [1983/24] | Priority number, date | FR19810022144 | 26.11.1981 Original published format: FR 8122144 | [1983/24] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0081401 | Date: | 15.06.1983 | Language: | FR | [1983/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0081401 | Date: | 18.03.1987 | Language: | FR | [1987/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.04.1983 | Classification | IPC: | B64G1/66 | [1983/24] | CPC: |
B64G1/6455 (EP);
B64G1/222 (US);
B64G1/2228 (EP);
B64G1/645 (US);
B64G1/44 (EP,US);
Y10S343/02 (EP,US);
Y10T24/44436 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1983/24] | Title | German: | System zur zeitweiligen Festlegung und Freigabe zweier Teile, insbesondere in der Raumfahrttechnik | [1983/24] | English: | System for the temporary holding and releasing of two parts, especially in space technology | [1983/24] | French: | Système permettant le maintien temporaire et la libération de deux parties, plus particulièrement dans le domaine spatial | [1983/24] | Examination procedure | 20.07.1983 | Examination requested [1983/39] | 20.11.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.03.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.03.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.06.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 19.09.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.11.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 20.11.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.12.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.10.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.10.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.10.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AP]DE3018245 (MESSERSCHMITT BOELKOW BLOHM [DE]) | Examination | DE2853070 |