EP0080954 - Connection and support arrangement for the electrodes of an arc furnace [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 02.05.1988 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: CH, LI | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CLECIM 107 boulevard de la Mission Marchand F-92400 Courbevoie / FR | [1983/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Davene, Jean 26 rue de Bel Air F-42390 Villars / FR | [1983/23] | Representative(s) | Le Brusque, Maurice, et al Cabinet HARLE et PHELIP 14-16, rue Ballu 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1985/26] | Le Brusque, Maurice, et al Cabinet Harlé et Phélip 21, rue de la Rochefoucauld F-75009 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1985/13] | Le Brusque, Maurice CREUSOT-LOIRE 15 rue Pasquier F-75383 Paris Cedex 08 / FR | ||
Former [1983/23] | Dupuy, Louis CREUSOT-LOIRE 15 rue Pasquier F-75383 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | Application number, filing date | 82402192.7 | 01.12.1982 | [1983/23] | Priority number, date | FR19810022521 | 01.12.1981 Original published format: FR 8122521 | [1983/23] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0080954 | Date: | 08.06.1983 | Language: | FR | [1983/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0080954 | Date: | 16.04.1986 | Language: | FR | [1986/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.03.1983 | Classification | IPC: | H05B7/103 | [1983/23] | CPC: |
H05B7/103 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1983/23] | Title | German: | Anschluss- und Tragevorrichtung für die Elektroden eines Lichtbogenofens | [1983/23] | English: | Connection and support arrangement for the electrodes of an arc furnace | [1983/23] | French: | Dispositif d'alimentation et de support d'électrodes pour four à arcs | [1983/23] | Examination procedure | 03.05.1983 | Examination requested [1983/29] | 26.11.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.05.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.07.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 18.10.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.12.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 19.12.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
16.01.1987
06.02.1987
ADMISSIBLE ASEA Aktiebolag S-721 83 Västeras / SE Opponent's representative Boecker, Joachim Hansmann & Vogeser Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Grosse Eschenheimer Strasse 39 60313 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/11] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
16.01.1987
06.02.1987
ADMISSIBLE ASEA Aktiebolag S-721 83 Västeras / SE Opponent's representative Boecker, Joachim, Dr.-Ing. Adelonstrasse 58 D-65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE | 24.03.1987 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 13.05.1987 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 15.01.1988 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 26.01.1988 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1988/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.11.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.10.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 02.12.1987 | [2015/21] |
Former [1989/26] | CH | 16.04.1986 | |
LI | 16.04.1986 | ||
SE | 02.12.1987 | ||
Former [1989/21] | SE | 02.12.1987 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR783511 ; | [Y]FR848766 (UMBRA PRODOTTI CHIMICI SOC); | [Y]US3395238 (ROBINSON CHARLES G); | [A]US3433878 (SUNDBERG YNGVE, et al); | [A]FR1569521 | Opposition | US2494775 |