EP0081427 - Package for fragile, heavy and/or deformable products [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.06.1986 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.07.1986 [1986/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VETROTEX SAINT-GOBAIN 767 quai des Allobroges F-73000 Chambéry / FR | [1983/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pivoteau, Jean Le petit Village no. 14 Route des Essarts F-73420 Le Viviers Du Lac / FR | 02 /
Durot, Jean-Pierre Le Pognient Ste Helene Du Lac F-73800 Montmelian / FR | [1983/24] | Representative(s) | Breton, Jean-Claude, et al SAINT-GOBAIN RECHERCHE 39, quai Lucien Lefranc 93300 Aubervilliers Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1983/24] | Breton, Jean-Claude, et al SAINT-GOBAIN RECHERCHE 39, quai Lucien Lefranc F-93300 Aubervilliers Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 82402196.8 | 02.12.1982 | [1983/24] | Priority number, date | FR19810022721 | 04.12.1981 Original published format: FR 8122721 | [1983/24] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0081427 | Date: | 15.06.1983 | Language: | FR | [1983/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0081427 | Date: | 07.08.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.03.1983 | Classification | IPC: | B65D5/50, B65D85/67 | [1983/24] | CPC: |
B65D85/672 (EP,US);
Y10S428/906 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT [1983/24] | Title | German: | Verpackung für spröde, schwere und/oder umformbare Produkte | [1983/24] | English: | Package for fragile, heavy and/or deformable products | [1983/24] | French: | Emballage pour produits fragiles, lourds et/ou déformables | [1983/24] | Examination procedure | 19.11.1983 | Examination requested [1984/04] | 27.06.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.10.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 31.01.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.02.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 13.02.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.05.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US3319866 (KITCHELL THORNE C); | [AD]US2615564 (POST JAMES D) |