EP0082085 - Device for the production of coated products such as biscuits and the like [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.02.1986 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.02.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.04.1986 [1986/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BISCUITERIE NANTAISE - BN Avenue Lotz-Cosse (près du Bd Alexandre Millerand) F-44200 Nantes / FR | [1983/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cossé, Lionel 13, rue de Belleville F-44100 Nantes / FR | [1985/15] |
Former [1983/25] | 01 /
Cosse, Lionel 13, rue de Belleville F-44100 Nantes / FR | Representative(s) | Phélip, Bruno, et al Cabinet Harlé & Phélip 7, rue de Madrid 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1983/25] | Phélip, Bruno, et al c/o Cabinet Harlé & Phélip 21, rue de La Rochefoucauld F-75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 82402298.2 | 14.12.1982 | [1983/25] | Priority number, date | FR19810023788 | 16.12.1981 Original published format: FR 8123788 | [1983/25] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0082085 | Date: | 22.06.1983 | Language: | FR | [1983/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0082085 | Date: | 10.04.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.04.1983 | Classification | IPC: | A21C15/00, A21C9/04 | [1983/25] | CPC: |
A21C9/04 (EP,US);
A21C15/002 (EP,US);
B65G2201/0205 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, IT, LI, NL [1983/25] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Herstellung von beschichteten Produkten, wie Keks und dergleichen | [1985/15] | English: | Device for the production of coated products such as biscuits and the like | [1983/25] | French: | Machine permettant la fabrication de produits enduits tels que biscuits ou autres | [1985/15] |
Former [1983/25] | Vorrichtung zur Herstellung von beschichteten Produkten, wie keks und dergleichen | ||
Former [1983/25] | Nouvelle machine permettant la fabrication de produits enduits tels que biscuits ou autres | Examination procedure | 15.08.1983 | Examination requested [1983/43] | 09.07.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 28.09.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.11.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 13.11.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.01.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.10.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US3340824 (TALBOT RICHARD C); | [AD]US4162882 (ROSE EDWARD [US]) |