EP0064470 - Device for guiding a yarn unwound from a spool fitted beneath another one in the case of a double twist twisting spindle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.09.1984 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.11.1984 [1984/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VERDOL S.A. 2-12, Avenue Barthélémy-Thimonnier F-69643 Caluire Cedex / FR | [1982/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Winkelmann, Roland 609, avenue du 8 mai F-69300 Caluire / FR | [1982/45] | Representative(s) | Karmin, Roger, et al Cabinet MONNIER, 142-150, Cours Lafayette, B.P. 3058 F-69392 Lyon Cédex 03 / FR | [1982/45] | Application number, filing date | 82420058.8 | 30.04.1982 | [1982/45] | Priority number, date | FR19810008833 | 30.04.1981 Original published format: FR 8108833 | [1982/45] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0064470 | Date: | 10.11.1982 | Language: | FR | [1982/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0064470 | Date: | 23.11.1983 | Language: | FR | [1983/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.07.1982 | Classification | IPC: | D01H1/10 | [1982/45] | CPC: |
D01H1/108 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, GB, IT [1982/45] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung für den Fadenablauf in dem Spulentopf einer Doppeldrahtzwirnspindel von einer Spule, die unter einer anderen angeordnet ist | [1982/45] | English: | Device for guiding a yarn unwound from a spool fitted beneath another one in the case of a double twist twisting spindle | [1982/45] | French: | Dispositif destiné à guider le déroulement du fil à partir d'une bobine disposée en dessous d'une autre dans le pot d'une broche à retordre | [1982/45] | Examination procedure | 27.11.1982 | Examination requested [1983/06] | 29.03.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 04.05.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.07.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 22.07.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.08.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1984/48] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE2827853 (PALITEX PROJECT CO GMBH); | [AD]DE2827814 (PALITEX PROJECT CO GMBH) |