EP0081446 - Method of and device for winding the inductive coils equipping electrical apparatuses such as transformers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 02.11.1988 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.11.1988 | Opposition rejected | published on 21.12.1988 [1988/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FRANCE TRANSFO (S.A.) Voie Romaine 57210 Maizieres Les Metz / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1983/24] | For all designated states FRANCE TRANSFO (S.A.) Voie Romaine F-57210 Maizieres Les Metz / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vazquez, Miguel 3, Allée de la Ferme La Grange au bois F-57070 Metz / FR | 02 /
Bildé, René 117, Rue de Lorient F-57070 Metz / FR | [1983/24] | Representative(s) | Ventavoli, Roger Cabinet ROVE Conseils 47, rue de Paris B.P. 50229 57106 Thionville Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1988/16] | Ventavoli, Roger 2, route d'Uckange F-57290 Fameck / FR | ||
Former [1983/24] | Ventavoli, Roger TECHMETAL PROMOTION Domaine de l'IRSID Immeuble Pacific 11-13, cours Valmy La Défense 7 - TSA 10001 F-92070 PARIS LA DEFENSE CEDEX / FR | Application number, filing date | 82440037.8 | 19.11.1982 | [1983/24] | Priority number, date | FR19810022614 | 01.12.1981 Original published format: FR 8122614 | [1983/24] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0081446 | Date: | 15.06.1983 | Language: | FR | [1983/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0081446 | Date: | 11.06.1986 | Language: | FR | [1986/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.1983 | Classification | IPC: | B65H54/80, H01F41/06 | [1983/24] | CPC: |
B65H54/80 (EP,KR,US);
H01F41/06 (KR);
H01F41/096 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1983/24] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Wickeln von induktiven Spulen mit denen elektrische Geräte, wie Transformatoren, ausgerüstet sind | [1983/24] | English: | Method of and device for winding the inductive coils equipping electrical apparatuses such as transformers | [1983/24] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de bobinage des enroulements inductifs équipant les appareils électriques, tels que les transformateurs | [1983/24] | Examination procedure | 13.12.1983 | Examination requested [1984/10] | 19.11.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.03.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.05.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.07.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.10.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 12.12.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.02.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 13.02.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
09.03.1987
14.04.1987
ADMISSIBLE Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/13] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
09.03.1987
14.04.1987
ADMISSIBLE Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 D-80506 München / DE | ||
Former [1987/20] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
09.03.1987
Siemens Aktiengesellschaft, Berlin und München Postfach 22 16 34 D-8000 München / DE Opponent's representative Mehl, Ernst, Dipl.-Ing. Postfach 22 13 17 D-80503 München / DE | 15.04.1987 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 10.08.1987 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 29.10.1987 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 22.12.1987 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 05.05.1988 | Date of oral proceedings | 26.07.1988 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 26.07.1988 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 05.08.1988 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [1988/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.11.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.11.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]SU173282 ; | [A]FR26143E (THOMSON HOUSTON COMP FRANCAISE); | [A]US2929577 (HENNING GEORGE E); | [A]DE1150450 (LEHNER FERNSPRECH SIGNAL); | [A]US3295785 (EUGENE FELICITE); | [A]FR1575213 ; | [Y]FR1584089 ; | [Y]DE2352679 (SCHLOEMANN SIEMAG AG) |