EP0066529 - Apparatus and method for slowing down and preventing edge damage on moving sheets [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1982/49] | Apparatus for slowing down and preventing edge damage on moving sheets | ||
[1985/36] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.07.1986 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.08.1986 [1986/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BELOIT CORPORATION P.O. Box 350 Beloit Wisconsin 53511 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1982/49] | For all designated states BELOIT CORPORATION P.O. Box 350 Beloit Wisconsin 53511 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Frye, Kenneth G. Box 406 Pinecrest Hill Road South Egremont Mass. 01258 / US | 02 /
Fitzpatrick, Donald C. RD 1 Reed Road Chatham, N.Y. 12037 / US | 03 /
Karis, Arthur T. 140 Housatonic Street Apt. 31 Lenox Mass. 01240 / US | [1982/49] | Representative(s) | Dennemeyer, John James, et al Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. 55, Rue des Bruyères 1274 Howald / LU | [N/P] |
Former [1982/49] | Dennemeyer, John James, et al Dennemeyer & Associates Sàrl P.O. Box 1502 L-1015 Luxembourg / LU | Application number, filing date | 82630047.7 | 07.05.1982 | [1982/49] | Priority number, date | US19810268002 | 28.05.1981 Original published format: US 268002 | [1982/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0066529 | Date: | 08.12.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0066529 | Date: | 04.09.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.09.1982 | Classification | IPC: | B65H29/68 | [1982/49] | CPC: |
B65H29/6627 (EP,US);
B65H29/68 (EP,US);
B65H2406/31 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1982/49] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Verlangsamung von bewegten Bogen und zur Verhütung von Kantenbeschädigungen | [1985/36] | English: | Apparatus and method for slowing down and preventing edge damage on moving sheets | [1985/36] | French: | Appareil et méthode de ralentissement de feuilles en mouvement et de prévention des dommages à leurs bords | [1985/36] |
Former [1982/49] | Vorrichtung zur Verlangsamung von bewegten Bogen und zur Verhütung von Kantenbeschädigungen | ||
Former [1982/49] | Apparatus for slowing down and preventing edge damage on moving sheets | ||
Former [1982/49] | Appareil de ralentissement de feuilles en mouvement et de prévention des dommages à leurs bords | Examination procedure | 03.06.1983 | Examination requested [1983/33] | 10.05.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.09.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 22.02.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.05.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 20.05.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.06.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.05.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US3554534 (GRODY DONALD R); | [A]CH450895 (WILL E C H FA [DE]); | [A]GB1048599 (SMITH AND WINCHESTER MFG COMPA); | [A]GB985227 (JAGENBERG WERKE AG); | [A]US1736482 (ALBERT BROADMEYER); | [A]DE2000078 (JAGENBERG WERKE AG) |