EP0069044 - Electric current converter motor of the synchronous type [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.07.1986 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.08.1986 [1986/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/01] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
V. Musil, Rudolf, Dipl.-Ing. Bredowstrasse 12 D-1000 Berlin21 / DE | [1983/01] | Application number, filing date | 82730070.8 | 27.05.1982 | [1983/01] | Priority number, date | DE19813126318 | 26.06.1981 Original published format: DE 3126318 | [1983/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0069044 | Date: | 05.01.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0069044 | Date: | 28.08.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.11.1982 | Classification | IPC: | H02P1/46 | [1983/01] | CPC: |
H02P1/46 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, LI, SE [1983/01] | Title | German: | Elektrischer Stromrichtermotor synchroner Bauart | [1983/01] | English: | Electric current converter motor of the synchronous type | [1983/01] | French: | Moteur électrique du type synchrone avec convertisseur de courant | [1983/01] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 15.06.1983 | Examination requested [1983/34] | 30.05.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.08.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.11.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 15.02.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.02.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 27.02.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.05.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1937371 (WILLIS CLODIUS H, et al); | [Y]CH237862 (BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE [CH]); | [Y]CH404797 (KUEBLER ERWIN PROF DR ING [DE]) | [A] - IEE PROCEEDINGS-B, Band 127, Nr. 6, November 1980, Seiten 375-381, Surrey,G.B. | [A] - BROWN BOVERI MITTEILUNGEN, Band 51, Nr. 8/9, August/September 1964, Seiten 526-530, Baden, CH. |