EP0071575 - Rail vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.01.1987 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.1990 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 18.07.1990 [1990/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ateliers de Constructions Mecaniques de Vevey S.A. CH-1800 Vevey / CH | [1983/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hess, Fritz Route de Blonay 116 CH-1814 La Tour de Peilz / CH | 02 /
Dalliard, Fernand Sous le Scex 2 CH-1844 Villeneuve / CH | [1983/06] | Representative(s) | Roth, Pierre, et al PIERRE ARDIN & CIE 22, rue du Mont-Blanc CH-1211 Genève 1 / CH | [1983/06] | Application number, filing date | 82810316.8 | 26.07.1982 | [1983/06] | Priority number, date | CH19810004934 | 30.07.1981 Original published format: CH 493481 | [1983/06] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0071575 | Date: | 09.02.1983 | Language: | FR | [1983/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0071575 | Date: | 02.04.1986 | Language: | FR | [1986/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.11.1982 | Classification | IPC: | B61D13/00, B61D3/10, B61F3/12, B61D23/02 | [1986/14] | CPC: |
B61F3/12 (EP,US);
B61D13/00 (EP,US);
B61D3/10 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1983/06] | B61D13/00, B61D3/10, B61F3/12 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL, SE [1983/06] | Title | German: | Eisenbahnfahrzeug | [1983/06] | English: | Rail vehicle | [1983/06] | French: | Véhicule ferroviaire | [1983/06] | Examination procedure | 02.05.1983 | Examination requested [1983/29] | 16.07.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.11.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.06.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 03.10.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.12.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 07.12.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.01.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.05.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]CH247907 (STRAUB DOT [CH]); | [A]FR1159975 (ATEL CONST NORD DE LA FRANCE); | [A]DE2647859 (INTERCOOPERATION KERESKEDELEMF); | [A]FR2391889 (LINKE HOFMANN BUSCH [DE]); | [Y]FR2440300 (SOCIMI [IT]); | [E]EP0058914 (DUEWAG AG [DE]) |