EP0058644 - Process for preparation of an oxychlorination catalyst precursor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1982/34] | Oxychlorination catalyst precursor and process for its preparation | ||
[1989/12] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 04.02.1989 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.03.2010 | Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representative | published on 21.04.2010 [2010/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ENICHEM SYNTHESIS S.p.A. Via Ruggero Settimo 55 90139 Palermo / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1988/34] | For all designated states ENICHEM SYNTHESIS S.p.A. Via Ruggero Settimo 55 I-90139 Palermo / IT | ||
Former [1982/34] | For all designated states EUTECO IMPIANTI S.p.A. Via Grazioli 11 I-20161 Milano / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Canavesi, Roberto Via Leopardi 4/b I-20020 Arese (Milano) / IT | 02 /
Ghezzi, Roberto Via Camelie 11 I-20095 Cusano Milanino (Milano) / IT | 03 /
Tagliabue, Vittorio Via Bolzano 5 I-20051 Limbiate (Milano) / IT | [1982/34] | Representative(s) | Rambelli, Paolo, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Corso Emilia 8 10152 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1988/34] | Rambelli, Paolo, et al c/o JACOBACCI & PERANI S.p.A. Corso Regio Parco, 27 I-10152 Torino / IT | ||
Former [1982/34] | Jacobacci, Filippo c/o JACOBACCI & PERANI S.p.A. Corso Regio Parco, 27 I-10152 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 82830020.2 | 01.02.1982 | [1982/34] | Priority number, date | IT19810019689 | 12.02.1981 Original published format: IT 1968981 | IT19810068126 | 17.08.1981 Original published format: IT 6812681 | [1982/34] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0058644 | Date: | 25.08.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0058644 | Date: | 28.08.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/35] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0058644 | Date: | 22.03.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.07.1982 | Classification | IPC: | B01J27/10, C07C17/156, C07C19/045, B01J35/10 | [1982/34] | CPC: |
B01J27/122 (EP,US);
B01J27/10 (EP,US);
C07C17/156 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C17/156, C07C19/045 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1982/34] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Oxychlorierungs-Kalatysatorvorläufers | [1989/12] | English: | Process for preparation of an oxychlorination catalyst precursor | [1989/12] | French: | Procédé de préparation d'un précurseur de catalyseur d'oxychlorination | [1989/12] |
Former [1982/34] | Oxychlorinierungskatalysatorvorstufe und Verfahren zu deren Herstellung | ||
Former [1982/34] | Oxychlorination catalyst precursor and process for its preparation | ||
Former [1982/34] | Précurseur de catalyseur d'oxychloration et procédé pour le préparer | Examination procedure | 23.11.1982 | Examination requested [1983/14] | 05.04.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.05.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.11.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 14.02.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.04.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 30.04.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
24.05.1986
12.06.1986
ADMISSIBLE The B.F. Goodrich Company 500 South Main Street Akron, Ohio / US Opponent's representative dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB, et al, et al Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | 02
26.05.1986
10.07.1986
ADMISSIBLE Akzo Nobel N.V. Velperweg 76 NL-6824 BM Arnhem / NL Opponent's representative Schalkwijk, Pieter Cornelis Akzo Nobel N.V. Intellectual Property Department P.O. Box 9300 6800 SB Arnhem / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2010/16] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
24.05.1986
12.06.1986
ADMISSIBLE The B.F. Goodrich Company 500 South Main Street Akron, Ohio / US Opponent's representative von Kreisler Selting Werner, et al, et al Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
02
26.05.1986
10.07.1986
ADMISSIBLE Akzo Nobel N.V. Velperweg 76 NL-6824 BM Arnhem / NL Opponent's representative Schalkwijk, Pieter Cornelis AKZO NOBEL N.V. Intellectual Property Department PO Box 9300 6800 SB Arnhem / NL | |||
Former [2009/29] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
24.05.1986
12.06.1986
ADMISSIBLE The B.F. Goodrich Company 500 South Main Street Akron, Ohio / US Opponent's representative von Kreisler, Alek, et al, et al Patentanwälte Von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 50462 Köln / DE | ||
02
26.05.1986
10.07.1986
ADMISSIBLE Akzo Nobel N.V. Velperweg 76 NL-6824 BM Arnhem / NL Opponent's representative Schalkwijk, Pieter Cornelis AKZO NOBEL N.V. Intellectual Property Department PO Box 9300 6800 SB Arnhem / NL | |||
Former [2008/28] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
24.05.1986
12.06.1986
ADMISSIBLE The B.F. Goodrich Company 500 South Main Street Akron, Ohio / US Opponent's representative von Kreisler, Alek, Dipl.-Chem., et al, et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 D-50462 Köln / DE | ||
02
26.05.1986
10.07.1986
ADMISSIBLE Akzo Nobel N.V. Velperweg 76 NL-6824 BM Arnhem / NL Opponent's representative Schalkwijk, Pieter Cornelis AKZO NOBEL N.V. Intellectual Property Department PO Box 9300 6800 SB Arnhem / NL | |||
Former [1986/31] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
24.05.1986
12.06.1986
ADMISSIBLE The B.F. Goodrich Company 500 South Main Street Akron, Ohio / US Opponent's representative von Kreisler, Alek, Dipl.-Chem., et al, et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 D-50462 Köln / DE | ||
02
26.05.1986
10.07.1986
ADMISSIBLE Akzo N.V. Velperweg 76 NL-6824 BM Arnhem / NL Opponent's representative Schalkwijk, Pieter Cornelis Akzo Nobel N.V. Patent Department P.O. 9300 NL-6800 SB Arnhem / NL | |||
Former [1986/29] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
24.05.1986
12.06.1986
ADMISSIBLE The B.F. Goodrich Company 500 South Main Street Akron, Ohio / US Opponent's representative von Kreisler, Alek, Dipl.-Chem., et al, et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 D-50462 Köln / DE | 27.05.1986 | No. 01: Reply to notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 30.05.1986 | No. 01: Notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 11.07.1986 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 22.12.1986 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 03.02.1987 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 02.04.1987 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 18.04.1988 | Date of oral proceedings | 27.07.1988 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 12.10.1988 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 24.12.1988 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.01.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.01.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE2543918 (SIR SOC ITALIANA RESINE SPA); | [Y]FR2318135 (STAUFFER CHEMICAL CO [US]); | [A]DE2651974 (BASF AG) |