EP0067135 - Electromechanical apparatus carrying out programmed passive gymnastics [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 17.09.1990 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.05.2011 | Change - representative | published on 08.06.2011 [2011/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states F.B.M.- HUDSON ITALIANA S.p.A. Piazzale Lotto, 2 I-20100 Milan / IT | For all designated states Ventura, Luciano Via Ardona, 1 I-22020 Torno (Como) / IT | [1987/20] |
Former [1984/36] | For all designated states OFMEC Officine Meccaniche Mantovane S.p.A. Via Parma 5/a Mantova / IT | ||
For all designated states Ventura, Luciano Via Ardona, 1 I-22020 Torno (Como) / IT | |||
Former [1982/50] | For all designated states Ventura, Angelo Via Ardona, 1 I-22020 Torno (Como) / IT | ||
For all designated states Ventura, Luciano Via Ardona, 1 I-22020 Torno (Como) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ventura, Angelo Via Adorne, 1 I-22020 Torno(Como) / IT | [2007/32] |
Former [1984/36] | 01 /
Ventura, Angelo Via Adorne, 1 | ||
Former [1982/50] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/23] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [1984/36] | Stockmair, Wilfried, Dr. Ing., et al Patentanwälte Grünecker, Kinkeldey Stockmair & Partner Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1982/50] | Cicogna, Franco Ufficio Internazionale Brevetti Dott.Prof. Franco Cicogna Via Visconti di Modrone, 14/A I-20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 82830137.4 | 21.05.1982 | [1982/50] | Priority number, date | IT19810022137 | 04.06.1981 Original published format: IT 2213781 | [1982/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0067135 | Date: | 15.12.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0067135 | Date: | 21.09.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.07.1983 | Classification | IPC: | A61H1/02 | [1982/50] | CPC: |
A61H1/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, LU, NL, SE [1982/50] | Title | German: | Elektromechanisches Gerät zur Durchführung von programmierten passiven gymnastischen Übungen | [1982/50] | English: | Electromechanical apparatus carrying out programmed passive gymnastics | [1982/50] | French: | Appareil électro-mécanique pour l'exécution d'exercises gymnastiques passifs programmés | [1982/50] | File destroyed: | 11.06.1996 | Examination procedure | 09.05.1983 | Examination requested [1983/30] | 05.10.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.02.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.04.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.08.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.05.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.08.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.02.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.07.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 20.03.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.11.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.12.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 11.06.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1990/45] | 21.06.1990 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1990/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.05.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.05.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.05.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.06.1989 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   29.06.1989 | 31.05.1990 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2681650 (GOSS RALPH B); | [Y]FR1121687 ; | [Y]US3060926 (MAY JAMES L) |