EP0078244 - Phenolic antioxidant compositions for organic polymers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 17.11.1986 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EUTECO IMPIANTI S.p.A. Via Grazioli 11 I-20161 Milano / IT | [1983/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Messina, Giuseppe Via Perpignan 27 I-07041 Alghero (Sassari) / IT | 02 /
Lorenzoni, Loreno Via Sassari 184 I-07046 Porto Torres (Sassari) / IT | 03 /
Fadda, Antonio Luciano Via Gaetano Salvemini 5 I-07100 Sassari / IT | [1983/18] | Representative(s) | Jacobacci, Filippo, et al c/o JACOBACCI & PERANI S.p.A. Corso Regio Parco, 27 I-10152 Torino / IT | [1983/18] | Application number, filing date | 82830253.9 | 12.10.1982 | [1983/18] | Priority number, date | IT19810024576 | 20.10.1981 Original published format: IT 2457681 | [1983/18] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0078244 | Date: | 04.05.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.02.1983 | Classification | IPC: | C08K5/00, C08K5/50 | [1983/18] | CPC: |
C08K5/13 (EP,US);
C08K5/50 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL, SE [1983/18] | Title | German: | Zusammensetzungen phenolischer Antioxidantien für organische Polymere | [1983/18] | English: | Phenolic antioxidant compositions for organic polymers | [1983/18] | French: | Compositions d'antioxidantes phénoliques pour polymères organiques | [1983/18] | File destroyed: | 04.12.1992 | Examination procedure | 07.07.1983 | Examination requested [1983/40] | 11.10.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.01.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.03.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.06.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.11.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 01.04.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.08.1986 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1987/02] | 17.08.1986 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1987/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP7108592 ; | [X]JP7740561 ; | [A]DE1236186 (ARGUS CHEM); | [A]US3635882 (STARR LEON, et al); | [X]DE2321120 (DYNAMIT NOBEL AG) | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 76, no. 10, 6th March 1972, page 34, no. 46934e, Columbus Ohio (USA); & JP - A - 71 08 592 (JAPAN CARBIDE INDUSTRIES CO., INC.) (04-03-1971), & JP7108592 A 00000000 | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 87, no. 8, 22nd August 1977, page 37, no. 54085w, Columbus Ohio (USA); & JP - A - 77 40 561 (NIPPON ZEON CO., LTD.) (29-03-1977), & JP7740561 A 00000000 |