EP0058650 - An hydraulically operated impact device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.07.1985 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.01.1986 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 19.03.1986 [1986/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Atlas Copco Aktiebolag Nacka 105 23 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/34] | For all designated states Atlas Copco Aktiebolag Nacka S-105 23 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Eklöf, Ake Torsten 257, Sätragardsvägen S-127 36 Skärholmen / SE | [1982/34] | Representative(s) | Aslund, G. Roland, et al C/o Atlas Copco Aktiebolag Patent Department 105 23 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/34] | Aslund, Roland, et al c/o Atlas Copco Aktiebolag Patent Department S-105 23 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 82850015.7 | 05.02.1982 | [1982/34] | Priority number, date | SE19810000961 | 11.02.1981 Original published format: SE 8100961 | [1982/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0058650 | Date: | 25.08.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0058650 | Date: | 19.09.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.06.1982 | Classification | IPC: | B25D17/24, E21C3/20 | [1982/34] | CPC: |
B25D17/24 (EP,US);
B25D9/12 (EP,US);
B25D9/145 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1982/34] | Title | German: | Hydraulisch betriebene Schlagvorrichtung | [1982/34] | English: | An hydraulically operated impact device | [1982/34] | French: | Appareil de percussion actionné hydrauliquement | [1982/34] | Examination procedure | 14.02.1983 | Examination requested [1983/17] | 01.12.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 28.02.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.05.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 12.05.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP84200906.0 Application deemed to be withdrawn : 04.09.1985 | Opposition(s) | 20.06.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.02.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 19.09.1984 | [1986/12] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1771672 (RUSSELL DEGENHARDT WILLIAM, et al); | [A]US3887019 (REYNOLDS LIONEL ARTHUR, et al); | [A]US3955478 (FEUCHT JACOB EDWARD); | [A]US4047595 (BAKER JR GLEN O); | [A]US4068727 (ANDERSSON KURT HOLGER, et al); | [AD]US4073350 (EKLOEF AAKE TORSTEN, et al); | [A]US4155287 (SELSAM ROGER L [US]) |