EP0079317 - Pneumatic power tool [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.11.1986 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.01.1987 [1987/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Atlas Copco Aktiebolag Nacka 105 23 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/20] | For all designated states Atlas Copco Aktiebolag Nacka S-105 23 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kardén, Karl Gösta 11, Östervägen S-131 33 Nacka / SE | [1983/20] | Representative(s) | Pantzar, Tord, et al Atlas Copco Tools AB Patent Department S-105 23 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/20] | Pantzar, Tord, et al Atlas Copco Tools AB Patent Department S-105 23 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 82850202.1 | 14.10.1982 | [1983/20] | Priority number, date | SE19810006210 | 21.10.1981 Original published format: SE 8106210 | [1983/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0079317 | Date: | 18.05.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0079317 | Date: | 29.01.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.03.1983 | Classification | IPC: | B24B55/00, F01C21/16, F01D15/06 | [1983/20] | CPC: |
B24B55/00 (EP,US);
F01D15/06 (EP,US);
Y02T50/60 (EP,US);
Y10T137/1026 (EP,US);
Y10T137/108 (EP,US);
Y10T137/1098 (EP,US);
Y10T137/1153 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1983/20] | Title | German: | Pneumatisch angetriebenes Werkzeug | [1983/20] | English: | Pneumatic power tool | [1983/20] | French: | Outil à entraînement pneumatique | [1983/20] | Examination procedure | 17.11.1983 | Examination requested [1984/04] | 09.10.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.01.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.06.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 18.07.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.10.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 10.10.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.10.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3749530 (AMADOR G); | [YD]US3923429 (SCHAEDLER RAYMOND J, et al); | [A]US4184819 (CLARK MELVIN D [US]); | [A]US3767332 (HUFFAKER D, et al) |