EP0072366 - Seal for sealing high-pressure devices [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.05.1986 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU State(s) deleted from list of lapses: DE | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VEREINIGTE EDELSTAHLWERKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT (VEW) Elisabethstrasse 12 A-1010 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1983/07] | For all designated states VEREINIGTE EDELSTAHLWERKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT (VEW) Elisabethstrasse 12 A-1010 Wien / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schier, Walter Theodor-Körner-Strasse 23 A-8600 Bruck/Mur / AT | [1983/07] | Representative(s) | Widtmann, Georg Vereinigte Edelstahlwerke AG (VEW) Elisabethstrasse 12 1010 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1983/07] | Widtmann, Georg, Dr. Vereinigte Edelstahlwerke Aktiengesellschaft (VEW) Elisabethstrasse 12 A-1010 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 82890112.4 | 03.08.1982 | [1983/07] | Priority number, date | AT19810003448 | 05.08.1981 Original published format: AT 344881 | [1983/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0072366 | Date: | 16.02.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0072366 | Date: | 26.06.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.1982 | Classification | IPC: | F16J15/16, F04B21/08 | [1983/07] | CPC: |
F04B53/164 (EP);
F16J15/32 (EP);
F16J15/48 (EP);
F16J15/56 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1983/07] | Title | German: | Dichtung zum Abdichten von Hochdruckeinrichtungen | [1983/07] | English: | Seal for sealing high-pressure devices | [1983/07] | French: | Joint pour l'étanchéification de dispositifs à haute pression | [1983/07] | Examination procedure | 04.03.1983 | Examination requested [1983/20] | 13.04.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.06.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.11.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 11.12.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.01.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 21.01.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.03.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.07.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 31.08.1985 | [1999/52] |
Former [1989/15] | DE | 04.02.1986 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2739745 ; | [A]DE7535535U ; | [A]FR793168 ; | [A]GB1008347 ; | [AD]AT296700B |