EP0069747 - TAPE FASTENER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 17.12.1985 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BONAS MACHINE COMPANY LIMITED Pallion Industrial Estate Sunderland, SR4 6SX / GB | [1983/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRIFFITH, John Dalton Bonas Machine Co. Ltd. Pallion Industrial Estate Sunderland SR4 6SX / GB | [1983/03] | Representative(s) | Dealtry, Brian, et al Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1983/03] | Dealtry, Brian, et al Eric Potter & Clarkson St. Mary's Court St. Mary's Gate Nottingham NG1 1LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 82900254.2 | 21.01.1982 | [1983/03] | WO1982GB00016 | Priority number, date | GB19810001886 | 22.01.1981 Original published format: GB 8101886 | [1983/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8202480 | Date: | 05.08.1982 | [1982/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0069747 | Date: | 19.01.1983 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.08.1982 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1983/03] | Search report(s) | Classification | IPC: | A44B18/00, B29C17/02 | [1983/03] | CPC: |
A44B18/0038 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, LU, NL, SE [1983/03] | Title | German: | KLETTENBAND-VERSCHLÜSSE | [1983/03] | English: | TAPE FASTENER | [1983/03] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE FIXATION A BANDE | [1983/03] | File destroyed: | 13.07.1991 | Entry into regional phase | 21.09.1982 | National basic fee paid | 21.09.1982 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.09.1982 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.09.1982 | Examination requested [1983/03] | 05.12.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.04.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.06.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.10.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.02.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 26.04.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.09.1985 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1986/08] | 14.09.1985 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1986/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.11.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.01.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2820277 ; | [X]DE2443050 ; | [X]US3629032 ; | [X]US3708382 ; | [X]US3031730 ; | [X]DE2209944 ; | [Y]US3767749 ; | [Y]US3708837 ; | [Y]US3320649 ; | [X]US3905071 ; | [Y]US3753458 ; | [Y]US3143154 ; | [Y]GB1140576 ; | [Y]GB1187103 |