EP0074956 - LIQUID GAS OPERATED LIGHTER, PARTICULARLY POCKET LIGHTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.12.1986 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.01.1987 [1987/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SCHÄCHTER, Friedrich Draschestrasse 31 A-1232 Wien / AT | [1983/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1983/13] | Representative(s) | Mitscherlich, Hans, et al Mitscherlich & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 33 06 09 80066 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/31] | Mitscherlich, Hans, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Mitscherlich & Partner Postfach 33 06 09 D-80066 München / DE | ||
Former [1984/16] | Mitscherlich, Hans, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. H. Mitscherlich Dipl.-Ing. K. Gunschmann Dipl.-Ing. Dr.rer.nat. W. Körber Dipl.-Ing. J. Schmidt-Evers Dipl.-Ing. W. Melzer Steinsdorfstrasse 10 D-8000 München 22 / DE | ||
Former [1983/13] | Barger, Erich, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Barger, Piso & Partner Postfach 333 A-1011 Wien / AT | ||
Schmidt-Evers, Jürgen, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Mitscherlich & Partner Postfach 33 06 09 D-80066 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 82900765.7 | 18.03.1982 | [1983/13] | WO1982AT00004 | Priority number, date | AT19810001306 | 19.03.1981 Original published format: AT 130681 | [1983/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8203262 | Date: | 30.09.1982 | [1982/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0074956 | Date: | 30.03.1983 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.09.1982 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1983/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0074956 | Date: | 12.02.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/07] | Search report(s) | Classification | IPC: | F23Q2/16 | [1983/13] | CPC: |
F23Q2/163 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1983/13] | Title | German: | MIT FLÜSSIGGAS BETRIEBENES FEUERZEUG, INSBESONDERE TASCHENFEUERZEUG | [1983/13] | English: | LIQUID GAS OPERATED LIGHTER, PARTICULARLY POCKET LIGHTER | [1983/13] | French: | BRIQUET FONCTIONNANT A GAZ LIQUIDE, NOTAMMENT BRIQUET DE POCHE | [1983/13] | Entry into regional phase | 26.10.1982 | National basic fee paid | 26.10.1982 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.03.1983 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.03.1983 | Examination requested [1983/23] | 24.01.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 22.06.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.08.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.01.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.04.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 18.07.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.10.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 18.10.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.11.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3854862 (WEBSTER M); | [A]US3963413 (LOCKWOOD JOHN C, et al); | [A]FR2397599 (GENOUD & CIE ETS [FR]); | [AP]EP0047708 (FEUDOR SA [FR]) | Examination | FR2313638 | FR2313639 | US3766946 |