EP0075572 - FLUID CONTAINERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.05.1988 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.05.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.06.1988 [1988/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rilett, John Walter Hilltop House, Old Quarry Bibury Gloucestershire GL7 5ND / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1983/14] | For all designated states Rilett, John Walter Hilltop House, Old Quarry Bibury, Gloucestershire GL7 5ND / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1983/14] | Representative(s) | Griffin, Kenneth David Saunders & Dolleymore LLP 9 Rickmansworth Road Watford WD18 0JU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1983/14] | Griffin, Kenneth David Saunders & Dolleymore 9, Rickmansworth Road Watford Hertfordshire WD1 7HE / GB | Application number, filing date | 82900979.4 | 05.04.1982 | [1983/14] | WO1982GB00105 | Priority number, date | GB19810010733 | 06.04.1981 Original published format: GB 8110733 | [1983/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8203441 | Date: | 14.10.1982 | [1982/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0075572 | Date: | 06.04.1983 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.10.1982 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1983/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0075572 | Date: | 01.07.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/27] | Search report(s) | Classification | IPC: | F17C1/14, F17C1/16, F17C13/10, F17C13/12, // A62C23/02 | [1983/14] | CPC: |
F17C13/123 (EP,US);
A62C13/76 (EP,US);
F17C1/14 (EP,US);
F17C1/16 (EP,US);
F17C13/10 (EP,US);
F17C2201/0109 (EP,US);
F17C2201/0114 (EP,US);
F17C2201/0119 (EP,US);
F17C2201/056 (EP,US);
F17C2203/0617 (EP,US);
F17C2203/0619 (EP,US);
F17C2203/0621 (EP,US);
F17C2203/0636 (EP,US);
F17C2203/0639 (EP,US);
F17C2203/0643 (EP,US);
F17C2203/0646 (EP,US);
F17C2203/0648 (EP,US);
F17C2203/0658 (EP,US);
F17C2203/066 (EP,US);
F17C2205/018 (EP,US);
F17C2205/0302 (EP,US);
F17C2205/0311 (EP,US);
F17C2205/0323 (EP,US);
F17C2205/0329 (EP,US);
F17C2205/0332 (EP,US);
F17C2205/0335 (EP,US);
F17C2205/0341 (EP,US);
F17C2205/037 (EP,US);
F17C2205/0397 (EP,US);
F17C2209/2118 (EP,US);
F17C2209/2136 (EP,US);
F17C2209/2154 (EP,US);
F17C2209/221 (EP,US);
F17C2209/227 (EP,US);
F17C2209/232 (EP,US);
F17C2221/011 (EP,US);
F17C2221/013 (EP,US);
F17C2221/014 (EP,US);
F17C2221/016 (EP,US);
F17C2221/017 (EP,US);
F17C2221/018 (EP,US);
F17C2221/033 (EP,US);
F17C2221/035 (EP,US);
F17C2223/0123 (EP,US);
F17C2223/0153 (EP,US);
F17C2223/035 (EP,US);
F17C2223/036 (EP,US);
F17C2223/043 (EP,US);
F17C2223/045 (EP,US);
F17C2223/046 (EP,US);
F17C2227/0309 (EP,US);
F17C2227/0316 (EP,US);
F17C2227/0341 (EP,US);
F17C2227/0381 (EP,US);
F17C2250/036 (EP,US);
F17C2250/0443 (EP,US);
F17C2250/0636 (EP,US);
F17C2260/011 (EP,US);
F17C2260/012 (EP,US);
F17C2260/013 (EP,US);
F17C2260/021 (EP,US);
F17C2260/023 (EP,US);
F17C2260/035 (EP,US);
F17C2260/053 (EP,US);
F17C2270/0189 (EP,US);
F17C2270/02 (EP,US);
F17C2270/025 (EP,US);
F17C2270/0563 (EP,US);
F17C2270/07 (EP,US);
F17C2270/0736 (EP,US);
F17C2270/0754 (EP,US);
Y10S220/901 (EP,US);
Y10T137/7937 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, LI, NL, SE [1983/14] | Title | German: | FLÜSSIGKEITSBEHÄLTER | [1983/14] | English: | FLUID CONTAINERS | [1983/14] | French: | CONTENEURS DE FLUIDES | [1983/14] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Entry into regional phase | 12.11.1982 | National basic fee paid | 12.11.1982 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.11.1982 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.11.1982 | Examination requested [1983/14] | 23.05.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.09.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.06.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 03.04.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.09.1986 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 18.09.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.12.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 17.12.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP87100047.7 / EP0231745 | Opposition(s) | 06.04.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/25] | Request for further processing for: | 18.09.1986 | Request for further processing filed | 17.09.1986 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.10.1986 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]BE358090 ; | [Y]US2290348 (MOULE REX E); | [A]FR1274058 ; | [A]FR1409664 ; | [A]FR1472966 (REYNOLDS TUBE COMPANY LTD); | [Y]GB1072502 (CIE DES PROD CHIM ET RAFFINERI); | [X]NL6615911 ; | [Y]FR2037802 (BEUTEL GERHARD); | [A]FR2041845 (LAFON GEORGES); | [A]FR2067600 (APPLIC GAZ SA); | [A]GB1311955 (RYAN J W, et al); | [A]US3817302 (KOWAL L, et al) |