EP0111475 - WINDOW ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 25.07.1986 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.1986 | Refusal of application | published on 10.09.1986 [1986/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nielsen, Hilmar Rasmus Tallasstigen 5 S-141 71 Huddinge / SE | [1984/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1984/26] | Representative(s) | Burman, Tore, et al AWAPATENT AB, Box 45086 104 30 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/26] | Burman, Tore, et al AWAPATENT AB, Box 45086 S-104 30 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 82901167.5 | 30.03.1982 | [1984/26] | WO1982SE00096 | Priority number, date | SE19820000111 | 11.01.1982 Original published format: SE 8200111 | [1984/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8302479 | Date: | 21.07.1983 | [1983/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0111475 | Date: | 27.06.1984 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.07.1983 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1984/26] | Search report(s) | Classification | IPC: | E06B3/08 | [1984/26] | CPC: |
E06B3/267 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL [1984/26] | Title | German: | FENSTERELEMENT | [1984/26] | English: | WINDOW ELEMENT | [1984/26] | French: | ELEMENT DE FENETRE | [1984/26] | File destroyed: | 04.12.1992 | Entry into regional phase | 01.02.1984 | National basic fee paid | 01.02.1984 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.02.1984 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.08.1983 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AT | 01.02.1984 | Examination requested [1984/26] | 01.03.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.06.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.08.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 06.12.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.04.1986 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1986/37] | 29.04.1986 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1986/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1984 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   27.04.1984 | 31.03.1986 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | DE1951517 [ ] (UHL KG GEB); | CH530547 [ ] (KRUPP GMBH [DE], et al); | US3786613 [ ] (SHEPHEARD W); | US4057944 [ ] (WYATT JR WILLIAM BURK, et al); | DE3029286 [ ] (TIPPMANN EUGENE RICHARD) |