EP0079905 - DISPENSER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 04.10.1985 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.1985 | Refusal of application | published on 04.12.1985 [1985/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HILL, Henry Rowland 72 Homer Road Solihull West Midlands / GB | For all designated states HILL, Christine Rosemary 72 Homer Road Solihull West Midlands / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1983/22] | For all designated states HILL, Henry Rowland 72 Homer Road Solihull West Midlands / GB | ||
For all designated states HILL, Christine Rosemary 72 Homer Road Solihull West Midlands / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1983/22] | Representative(s) | Lewis, Samuel H., et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 D-80801 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/22] | Lewis, Samuel Hewitt, et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 D-80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 82901524.7 | 28.05.1982 | [1983/22] | WO1982GB00154 | Priority number, date | GB19810016595 | 30.05.1981 Original published format: GB 8116595 | [1983/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8204238 | Date: | 09.12.1982 | [1982/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0079905 | Date: | 01.06.1983 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.12.1982 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1983/22] | Search report(s) | Classification | IPC: | B65D35/28 | [1983/22] | CPC: |
B65D35/28 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, LI, NL, SE [1983/22] | Title | German: | ABGABEVORRICHTUNG | [1983/22] | English: | DISPENSER | [1983/22] | French: | DISTRIBUTEUR | [1983/22] | File destroyed: | 07.12.1992 | Entry into regional phase | 18.01.1983 | National basic fee paid | 18.01.1983 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.01.1983 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.01.1983 | Examination requested [1983/22] | 10.04.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.06.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 18.02.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.06.1985 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1985/49] | 06.07.1985 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1985/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.05.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE2609675 (LOBMEYER); | [X]GB694879 (GRAHAM HITCHINS LTD W); | [X]US2755967 (ANDERSON JACK C, et al); | [A]US2128567 (WILSON RALPH W, et al) |