EP0081515 - MECHANISM AND DEVICE FOR APPLYING A FORCE, IN PARTICULAR THE APPLICATION OF A MANUALLY-GENERATED FORCE TO A WORKPIECE, FOR EXAMPLE IN THE SEPARATION OF CO-OPERATING MALE AND FEMALE PARTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.09.1983 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.09.1983 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.11.1983 [1983/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kinnersly, Richard Furneaux Bramfield Slab Lane West Wellow Nr. Romsey Hants SO5 0BY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1983/25] | For all designated states Kinnersly, Richard Furneaux Bramfield Slab Lane West Wellow Nr. Romsey Hants SO5 0BY / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1983/25] | Application number, filing date | 82901724.3 | 11.06.1982 | [1983/25] | WO1982GB00175 | Priority number, date | GB19810017922 | 11.06.1981 Original published format: GB 8117922 | [1983/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8204415 | Date: | 23.12.1982 | [1982/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0081515 | Date: | 22.06.1983 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.1982 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1983/25] | Search report(s) | Classification | IPC: | B25B27/02, F15B15/14 | [1983/25] | CPC: |
B25B27/026 (EP);
F15B11/0365 (EP);
F15B2211/2053 (EP);
F15B2211/7052 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, LU, NL, SE [1983/25] | Title | German: | MECHANISMUS UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM AUSÜBEN EINER KRAFT, INSBESONDERE DIE AUSÜBUNG EINER HANDERZEUGTEN KRAFT AUF EINEM WERKSTÜCK, ZUM BEISPIEL BEI DER TRENNUNG VON ZUSAMMENARBEITENDEN MÄNNLICHEN UND WEIBLICHEN TEILEN | [1983/25] | English: | MECHANISM AND DEVICE FOR APPLYING A FORCE, IN PARTICULAR THE APPLICATION OF A MANUALLY-GENERATED FORCE TO A WORKPIECE, FOR EXAMPLE IN THE SEPARATION OF CO-OPERATING MALE AND FEMALE PARTS | [1983/25] | French: | MECANISME ET DISPOSITIF SERVANT A APPLIQUER UNE FORCE, NOTAMMENT UNE FORCE PRODUITE MANUELLEMENT, A UNE PIECE A USINER, PAR EXEMPLE POUR LA SEPARATION DE PARTIES MALE ET FEMELLE AGISSANT DE CONCERT | [1983/25] | File destroyed: | 18.06.1989 | Examination procedure | 14.06.1983 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [1983/47] | 13.07.1983 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 25.08.1983 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1983/47] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 11.03.1983 | AT   M02   Not yet paid | 11.03.1983 | BE   M02   Not yet paid | 11.03.1983 | CH   M02   Not yet paid | 11.03.1983 | DE   M02   Not yet paid | 11.03.1983 | FR   M02   Not yet paid | 11.03.1983 | GB   M02   Not yet paid | 11.03.1983 | LU   M02   Not yet paid | 11.03.1983 | NL   M02   Not yet paid | 11.03.1983 | SE   M02   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 23.06.1983 | M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4063412 ; | [Y]US3691609 ; | [X]DE1601762 ; | [X]CH518158 ; | [Y]US2902007 ; | [A]CA1094301 ; | [A]US3948051 |