EP0081595 - VOICE SYNTHESIZER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.07.1988 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.08.1988 [1988/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd. 55, Hondori 2-Chome, Keihan Moriguchi-shi Osaka / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1983/25] | For all designated states SANYO ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 18, 2 chome, Keihan-Hondori Moriguchi-shi, Osaka 570 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUGIURA, Youji 1486 Kamimakuwa Shinsei-cho Motosu-gun Gifu-ken 501-04 / JP | [1983/25] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/25] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 26 01 62 D-80058 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 82901856.3 | 18.06.1982 | [1983/25] | WO1982JP00233 | Priority number, date | JP19810094802 | 18.06.1981 Original published format: JP 9480281 | [1983/25] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8204493 | Date: | 23.12.1982 | [1982/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0081595 | Date: | 22.06.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0081595 | Date: | 09.09.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.10.1983 | Classification | IPC: | G10L3/00, G10L9/08 | [1987/37] | CPC: |
G10L13/02 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1983/25] | G10L1/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1983/25] | Title | German: | SPRACHSYNTHESIZER | [1983/25] | English: | VOICE SYNTHESIZER | [1983/25] | French: | SYNTHETISEUR VOCAL | [1983/25] | Entry into regional phase | 26.01.1983 | Translation filed | 26.01.1983 | National basic fee paid | 26.01.1983 | Search fee paid | 26.01.1983 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.04.1983 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.04.1983 | Examination requested [1983/27] | 01.03.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.09.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.09.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.01.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.04.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.07.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 18.12.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.03.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 19.03.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.06.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.06.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.06.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.06.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3104284 [ ] (FRENCH WALTER K, et al); | FR2364520 [ ] (ANVAR [FR]); | US4210781 [ ] (NISHIMURA SATOSHI [JP], et al); | GB2098032 [ ] (EVENTIDE CLOCKWORKS INC) | International search | [A]JPS4881008 ; | [A]JPS5062709 ; | [A]JPS5597000 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO) | Examination | - FUNKSCHAU, vol. 49, no. 18, August 1977 MÜNCHEN (DE) "Trotz veränderter Geschwindigkeit: Gleiche Tonhöhe", pages 847-851. | - ELECTRONICS, vol. 49, no. 8, April 15, 1976 NEW YORK (US) "Digitally compressed voice patters amiably", pages 31-32. |