EP0081541 - DEVICE FOR ADJUSTING THE HEIGHT OF BUILDING BLOCKS AND THE LIKE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1983/25] | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR ADJUSTING THE HEIGHT OF BUILDING BLOCKS AND THE LIKE | ||
[1985/13] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.01.1986 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.02.1988 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 30.03.1988 [1988/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HANOTA HOLDINGS S.A. 37, rue Notre Dame Luxembourg / LU | [1983/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Van de CAVEYE, Yves 83 rue Mattot B-1410 Waterloo / BE | 02 /
SCHAEFLE, Henri 2Bis rue du Pied du Mont F-60600 Clermont / FR | [1983/25] | Representative(s) | Callewaert, Jean, et al Gevers Rue de Livourne 7 1060 Bruxelles / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/25] | Callewaert, Jean, et al GEVERS Patents, Brussels Airport Business Park, Holidaystraat 5 B-1831 Diegem / BE | Application number, filing date | 82901902.5 | 11.06.1982 | [1983/25] | WO1982BE00016 | Priority number, date | BE19810205169 | 22.06.1981 Original published format: BE 205169 | [1983/25] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8300028 | Date: | 06.01.1983 | [1983/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0081541 | Date: | 22.06.1983 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.01.1983 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1983/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0081541 | Date: | 27.03.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/13] | Search report(s) | Classification | IPC: | B28B11/02, E04C1/10 | [1983/25] | CPC: |
B28B11/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL, SE [1983/25] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM ANPASSEN DER HÖHE VON BAUBLOCKEN UND DERGLEICHEN | [1985/13] | English: | DEVICE FOR ADJUSTING THE HEIGHT OF BUILDING BLOCKS AND THE LIKE | [1985/13] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR AJUSTER LA HAUTEUR DE BLOCS DE CONSTRUCTION ET ANALOGUES | [1985/13] |
Former [1983/25] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM ANPASSEN DER HÖHE VON BAUBLOCKEN UND DERGLEICHEN | ||
Former [1983/25] | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR ADJUSTING THE HEIGHT OF BUILDING BLOCKS AND THE LIKE | ||
Former [1983/25] | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR AJUSTER LA HAUTEUR DE BLOCS DE CONSTRUCTION ET ANALOGUES | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Entry into regional phase | 15.02.1983 | National basic fee paid | 15.02.1983 | Search fee paid | 15.02.1983 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.05.1983 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.05.1983 | Examination requested [1983/31] | 24.02.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.06.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.08.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 11.09.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.12.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 11.12.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.12.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.03.1985 | NL | 27.03.1985 | SE | 30.03.1985 | [1988/13] |
Former [1986/28] | AT | 27.03.1985 | |
NL | 27.03.1985 | ||
Former [1986/23] | AT | 27.03.1985 | Cited in | International search | [X]FR2440258 (HANOTA HOLDINGS SA [LU]); | [A]FR2311148 (COMMUNEAU ROGER [FR]); | [A]DE2104352 (STUEWE GUSTAV); | [A]US3809595 (NICHOLS C, et al); | [A]FR2283762 (ANCHOR BUILDING PRODUCTS LTD [GB]) |