EP0085710 - RUBBER COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.01.1988 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.01.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.03.1988 [1988/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RUBBER RESEARCH ELASTOMERICS INC. 824 Ninth Avenue S.E. Minneapolis, MN 55414 / US | [1983/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STARK, Fred J., Jr. 4507 Willow Oak Lane Minnetonka, MN 55343 / US | [1983/33] | Representative(s) | Parr, Ronald Edward R.E. Parr & Co., Colman House, Station Road Knowle, Solihull West Midlands B93 0HL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1983/42] | Parr, Ronald Edward R.E. Parr & Co. Colman House Station Road Knowle Solihull West Midlands B93 0HL / GB | Application number, filing date | 82902789.5 | 10.08.1982 | [1983/33] | WO1982US01081 | Priority number, date | US19810291386 | 10.08.1981 Original published format: US 291386 | [1983/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8300489 | Date: | 17.02.1983 | [1983/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0085710 | Date: | 17.08.1983 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.02.1983 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1983/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0085710 | Date: | 18.03.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.12.1983 | Classification | IPC: | C08L7/00, C08L9/00, C08L9/06 | [1983/33] | CPC: |
C08L19/003 (EP,US);
C08L21/00 (EP,US);
Y10S264/912 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08L21/00, C08L2666/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, LU, NL [1983/33] | Title | German: | KAUTSCHUKZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [1983/33] | English: | RUBBER COMPOSITIONS | [1983/33] | French: | COMPOSITIONS DE CAOUTCHOUC | [1983/33] | Entry into regional phase | 11.07.1983 | National basic fee paid | 11.07.1983 | Search fee paid | 11.07.1983 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.08.1983 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.08.1983 | Examination requested [1983/42] | 14.06.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 21.12.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.04.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 19.09.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.12.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 16.12.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.12.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.07.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.08.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 11.05.1983 | BE   M02   Fee paid on   11.07.1983 | 11.05.1983 | DE   M02   Fee paid on   11.07.1983 | 11.05.1983 | FR   M02   Fee paid on   11.07.1983 | 11.05.1983 | GB   M02   Fee paid on   11.07.1983 | 11.05.1983 | LU   M02   Fee paid on   11.07.1983 | 11.05.1983 | NL   M02   Fee paid on   11.07.1983 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3281389 (HIRSHFIELD STANLEY M); | [A]US3489710 (BONOTTO SERGIO, et al); | [A]US3726944 (BENNETT R, et al); | [Y]US4101463 (MORGAN DONALD F, et al); | [A]US4125578 (SEAR DEREK W); | [A]US4257925 (FREEGUARD GRAHAM F); | [Y]US4244841 (FRANKLAND W HOWARD); | [P]US4304885 (OMORI TOSHIO, et al) |