EP0089983 - METHOD FOR HARVESTING ALGAE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.12.1986 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.12.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.01.1987 [1987/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMMONWEALTH SCIENTIFIC AND INDUSTRIAL RESEARCH ORGANISATION 407 Royal Parade Parkville, VIC 3052 / AU | For all designated states BETATENE LIMITED 71-73 Taunton Drive Cheltenham, VIC 3192 / AU | [N/P] |
Former [1985/45] | For all designated states COMMONWEALTH SCIENTIFIC AND INDUSTRIAL RESEARCH ORGANISATION 407 Royal Parade Parkville, VIC 3052 / AU | ||
For all designated states BETATENE LIMITED 71-73 Taunton Drive Cheltenham, VIC 3192 / AU | |||
Former [1983/40] | For all designated states COMMONWEALTH SCIENTIFIC AND INDUSTRIAL RESEARCH ORGANISATION 407 Royal Parade Parkville, VIC 3052 / AU | ||
For all designated states COCKAJEMMY PTY. LTD. 355 Glenhuntly Road Elsternwick, VIC3185 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CURTAIN, Cyril Curtis 12 The Esplanade Williamstown, VIC / AU | 02 /
SNOOK, Harvey 6 Park Lane Aspendale, VIC / AU | [1983/40] | Representative(s) | Armitage, Ian Michael, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1983/40] | Armitage, Ian Michael, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 82902897.6 | 07.10.1982 | [1983/40] | WO1982AU00165 | Priority number, date | AU19810001093 | 07.10.1981 Original published format: AU 109381 | [1983/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8301257 | Date: | 14.04.1983 | [1983/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0089983 | Date: | 05.10.1983 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.04.1983 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1983/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0089983 | Date: | 29.01.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.03.1984 | Classification | IPC: | C12N1/02, C12N1/12, A01D44/00, B01D15/08 | [1983/40] | CPC: |
C07C403/24 (EP,US);
C12N1/02 (EP,US);
C12N1/12 (EP,US);
C12P23/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, LU, NL, SE [1983/40] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM ERNTEN VON ALGEN | [1983/40] | English: | METHOD FOR HARVESTING ALGAE | [1983/40] | French: | PROCEDE DE RECOLTE D'ALGUES | [1983/40] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Entry into regional phase | 27.06.1983 | National basic fee paid | 27.06.1983 | Search fee paid | 27.06.1983 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.10.1983 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.10.1983 | Examination requested [1983/50] | 04.10.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 08.12.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 15.05.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.07.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 01.07.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.10.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.10.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.10.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]AU487018B | International search | [A]AU3400863B ; | [A]US3195271 (GOLUEKE CLARENCE G, et al); | [A]US4115949 (AVRON MORDHAY, et al); | [A]US4199895 (AVRON MORDHAY [IL], et al) | Examination | AU285923B |