EP0090828 - TROUGH-LIKE COLLAR FOR THE UPPER EXTERNAL RIM OF FUEL RESERVOIRS FOR COOLING THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.01.1984 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UCERPO S/A. IDEIAS, PESQUIZAS E INVENCOES Travessa Grassi, 8 Sao Paulo / BR | [1983/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SOBRINHO, Luiz Cocozza Rua Estados Unidos, 562 Jd. Paulista, 01427 Sao Paulo / BR | [1983/41] | Application number, filing date | 82903034.5 | 01.10.1982 | [1983/41] | WO1982BR00014 | Priority number, date | BR6101373U | 01.10.1981 Original published format: BR 6101373 U | [1983/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8301200 | Date: | 14.04.1983 | [1983/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0090828 | Date: | 12.10.1983 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.04.1983 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1983/41] | Search report(s) | Classification | IPC: | A62C13/24, B65D25/00 | [1983/41] | CPC: |
A62C3/06 (EP);
B65D90/22 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | FR [1983/41] | Title | German: | MULDENFÖRMIGER RING FÜR DEN ÄUSSEREN RAND EINES KRAFTSTOFFBEHÄLTERS ZU DESSEN KÜHLUNG | [1983/41] | English: | TROUGH-LIKE COLLAR FOR THE UPPER EXTERNAL RIM OF FUEL RESERVOIRS FOR COOLING THEREOF | [1983/41] | French: | COLLIER EN FORME D'AUGE POUR LE BORD EXTERNE SUPERIEUR DES RESERVOIRS DE CARBURANT, PERMETTANT LEUR REFROIDISSEMENT | [1983/41] | File destroyed: | 14.07.1990 | Examination procedure | 27.09.1983 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [1984/12] | 29.11.1983 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1984/12] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 30.06.1983 | FR   M02   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 14.10.1983 | M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]GB530892 ; | [Y]DE722790 ; | [Y]DK20361 ; | [A]FR856975 |