EP0089369 - PRESSURE-RESPONSIVE TOURNIQUET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.01.1984 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.1984 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.03.1984 [1984/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CLARK, Nancy G. 3324 Howell Middle Drive Duluth, GA 30136 / US | [1983/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1983/39] | Application number, filing date | 82903123.6 | 24.09.1982 | [1983/39] | WO1982US01317 | Priority number, date | US19810306176 | 28.09.1981 Original published format: US 306176 | [1983/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8300995 | Date: | 31.03.1983 | [1983/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0089369 | Date: | 28.09.1983 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.03.1983 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1983/39] | Search report(s) | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/12 | [1983/39] | CPC: |
A61B17/1355 (EP);
A61H2201/5074 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, LU, NL, SE [1983/39] | Title | German: | DRUCKEMPFINDLICHE MANSCHETTE | [1983/39] | English: | PRESSURE-RESPONSIVE TOURNIQUET | [1983/39] | French: | TOURNIQUET SENSIBLE A LA PRESSION | [1983/39] | File destroyed: | 14.07.1990 | Examination procedure | 23.09.1983 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [1984/11] | 23.11.1983 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1984/11] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 30.06.1983 | AT   M02   Not yet paid | 30.06.1983 | BE   M02   Not yet paid | 30.06.1983 | CH   M02   Not yet paid | 30.06.1983 | DE   M02   Not yet paid | 30.06.1983 | FR   M02   Not yet paid | 30.06.1983 | GB   M02   Not yet paid | 30.06.1983 | LU   M02   Not yet paid | 30.06.1983 | NL   M02   Not yet paid | 30.06.1983 | SE   M02   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 03.10.1983 | M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]GB1253501 ; | [YP]US4321929 | [Y] - "Complications of and Improvements in Pneumatic Tourniquets used in Surgery"; Medical Instrumentation Vol. 15, No. 4, McEWEN, published July-August 1981pp. 253-257 |